Tilsor, S.A. v. Oracle Caribbean, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tilsor, S.A.
Defendant: John Doe, Oracle Caribbean, Inc. and ABC Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01875
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents at Docket No. 36 filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Tilsor, S.A. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION to Supplement Dockets 1, 2 and Preliminary Injunction Due to Recent Events re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against Defendants filed by Tilsor, S.A., #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Tilsor, S.A. filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration under Penalty of Perjury, #2 Exhibit I - Notice of Intimation - OSE, #3 Exhibit II - Notice of Expiration - Telefonica, #4 Exhibit III - Bid Award - Telefonica, #5 Exhibit IV - Cancellation Telegram - Telefonica)(Related document(s) #2 , #1 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
October 29, 2019 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll: Case called for Preliminary Injunction Hearing but not held on 10/29/2019. Present on behalf of Plaintiff were Attorney Francisco Ojeda-Diez and Attorney Kenneth Suria-Rivera, on behalf of the Defendants Attorney Manuel Fernandez-Bared and Attorney Nayda Perez-Roman. The parties stated on the record their position respect to pending filings and motions and then engaged in meaningful settlement conversation which are on their way. Parties will inform by 1:30 PM of 10/30/2019 if they have reached an agreement in principle, dispositive of all pending matters. If the parties have not reached an agreement by then, the Preliminary Injunction Hearing will begin at 1:30 PM on 10/30/2019 at Courtroom 8 before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. (Court Reporter DCR / Courtroom 8.) (ram) Modified on 10/29/2019 to correct date as to parties' report (mr).
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition / Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Re: #33 MOTION to Strike Docket No. 30 Re: #30 Objection to filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Tilsor, S.A. filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc.. (Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 28, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Strike Docket No. 30 Re: #30 Objection to filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Tilsor, S.A. Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
October 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike Defendant Orcacle's Reply to Plaintiff;s Memorandum of Law in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss" or, alternatively, for leave to file sur-reply Re: #31 Objection to, filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Tilsor, S.A. Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
October 25, 2019 Filing 31 OBJECTION / Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Re: #19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Tilsor, S.A. filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc.. (Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 25, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION / OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 11/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Document and for Extension of Time filed by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #23 Motion to Continue. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 10/21/2019. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER noted #21 Motion submitting certified translations. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 10/21/2019. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 10/21/2019. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion at Docket Nos. 14 and 23, and Motion to Deem Docket No. 2 as Unopposed filed by Tilsor, S.A. Re: #14 MOTION regarding Docket 12 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against Defendants filed by Tilsor, S.A., #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Tilsor, S.A., #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against Defendants filed by Tilsor, S.A., #23 MOTION to Continue / Motion for Brief Continuance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Tilsor, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Attachment A)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Continue / Motion for Brief Continuance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Noting #20 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (ebb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Manuel Fernandez-Bared on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 10/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fernandez-Bared, Manuel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nayda I. Perez-Roman on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. (Perez-Roman, Nayda)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Tilsor, S.A. Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Tilsor, S.A.. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Denying #17 "Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel" pending appearance of new legal representation. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/11/2019. (MPL)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 10/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER : Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 10/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Joint Motions to continue the Preliminary Injunction Hearing shall include three alternative dates in which all parties are available. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 10/8/2019. (mcv)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING #12 "Motion to Dismiss," #13 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents," #14 "Motion Regarding Docket 12" to U.S. Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/1/2019. (MPL)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION regarding Docket 12 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against Defendants filed by Tilsor, S.A., #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Tilsor, S.A., #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Oracle Caribbean, Inc. filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #2 , #1 , #12 ) (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting #8 "Motion In Compliance with Order." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/20/2019. (EMJ)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting #9 "Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/19/2019. (ebb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V on behalf of Oracle Caribbean, Inc. (Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V, Sylvia)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Motion In Compliance with this Honorable Court's Order of September 17, 2019 filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Tilsor, S.A. Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summons as to Oracle Caribbean Inc., #2 Exhibit Unsworn Statement under Penalty of Perjury pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746)(Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting #6 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/17/2019. (ebb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance and request for notice by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Tilsor, S.A. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: See attached. The request for a Temporary Restraining Order at Docket No. 2 is DENIED. The case is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll to hold a hearing on the Preliminary Injunction requested and issue a Report and Recommendation. Service of process in accordance with this order is due by noontime on September 20, 2019. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/17/2019. (EMJ)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Oracle Caribbean, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/17/2019 to correct date of signature) (mr).
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ***EX-PARTE***Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order against Defendants filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Tilsor, S.A. Responses due by 9/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration under Penalty of Perjury of Jorge L. Vidart Narancio, #3 Memorandum of Law)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6591083.), filed by Tilsor, S.A.. Service due by 12/16/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit 1. MDA, #5 Exhibit 2. Renewal Plat., #6 Exhibit 3. Oracle U., #7 Exhibit 4. Fuda-MDA emails, #8 Exhibit 5. Temporary extension emails, #9 Exhibit 6. OPN letters, #10 Exhibit 7. Emails on orders rejections, #11 Exhibit 8. Ethics Point Report, #12 Exhibit 9. Oracle's response 5/20/19, #13 Exhibit 10. Email to Vamos and Silveira 5/23/19, #14 Exhibit 11. Email to Vamos and Silveira, #15 Exhibit 12. Email to D. Daley 5/24/19, #16 Exhibit 13. Email with letter for Azor 5/24/19, #17 Exhibit 14. String of Emails D. Daley 5/28/19, #18 Exhibit 15. Email to Silveira 5/28/19, #19 Exhibit 16. Email to Silveira and Daley 6/6/19, #20 Exhibit 17. String of Emails Vidart 6/18/19, #21 Exhibit 18. String of Emails Vidart-Azeredo 6/21/19, #22 Exhibit 19. Email from client, #23 Exhibit 20. Email Azeredo-Vidart 7/30/19, #24 Exhibit 21. Email for client, #25 Exhibit 22. Letter from client, #26 Exhibit 23. Accountant's Debt Certification, #27 Exhibit 24. Accounting Certificate, #28 Exhibit 25. Letter to Oracle 7-15-19)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilsor, S.A. v. Oracle Caribbean, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Caribbean, Inc.
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Nayda I. Perez-Roman
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi-Lopez-de-V
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilsor, S.A.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?