Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC v. Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC
Defendant: Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01879
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAPFRE PRAICO ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC filed by Bayoan Muniz-Calderon on behalf of Plaintiff Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Muniz-Calderon, Bayoan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 13, 2019 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Bayoan Muniz-Calderon on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Calderon, Bayoan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCapital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC. (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mapfre Praico Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6593999.), filed by Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC. Service due by 12/16/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Casellas-Santana, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC v. Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Represented By: Bayoan Muniz-Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?