Clarks Americas, Inc. v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clarks Americas, Inc.
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01887
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Xaymara Colon-Gonzalez on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Propiedad, Inc..(Colon-Gonzalez, Xaymara)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/29/2019. (EES)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo on behalf of Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. (Carvajal-Zarabozo, Ian)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2019 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Clarks Americas, Inc. filed by Xaymara Colon-Gonzalez on behalf of Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Colon-Gonzalez, Xaymara)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #5 INFORMATIVE motion Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/24/2019. (EES)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Returned summons filed by Edgardo Colon-Arraras on behalf of Clarks Americas, Inc. Responses due by 10/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned summons)(Colon-Arraras, Edgardo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young.(Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0104-6595630) (arg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byClarks Americas, Inc.. (Colon-Arraras, Edgardo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Triple-S Propiedad, Inc., filed by Clarks Americas, Inc.. Service due by 12/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Current Address, #4 Summons Triple-S Propiedad)(Colon-Arraras, Edgardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarks Americas, Inc. v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarks Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Edgardo Colon-Arraras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?