East Towing & Salvage, Inc. v. Blue Ocean 1 LLC et al
Plaintiff: East Towing & Salvage, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Ocean 1 LLC and Hector Hoyos-Aliff
Garnishee: Hoyos Integrity Corp. and Hoyos Group Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01890
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time until December 2, 2019 to Answer Verified Complaint and Set of Interrogatories filed by Manolo T. Rodriguez-Bird on behalf of Hoyos Integrity Corp. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Bird, Manolo)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time until December 2, 2019 to Answer Verified Complaint and Set of Interrogatories filed by Manolo T. Rodriguez-Bird on behalf of Hoyos Group Corp. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Bird, Manolo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of East Towing & Salvage, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of East Towing & Salvage, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by East Towing & Salvage, Inc. upon Hector Hoyos-Aliff served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Writ of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment Issued. (Original and certified copy sent via mail to Atty. Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III.) (rim)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES***ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/18/2019.(wm)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ of Attachment; granting #3 Motion to Restrict; noted #6 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/18/2019. (wm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 ***EX-PARTE***Emergency MOTION to Expedite Order for Issuance of Write of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of East Towing & Salvage, Inc. Responses due by 10/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Exhibits filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of East Towing & Salvage, Inc. Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto) Modified on 9/19/2019 to edit docket title (rom).
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of East Towing & Salvage, Inc. Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castaner-Padro, Alberto) ***MODIFIED on 9/19/2019 to remove restriction. Standing Order No. 9 states that the Motion to Restrict... "shall be open to public inspection..."*** (rom).
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III on behalf of East Towing & Salvage, Inc. Responses due by 10/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 ***EX-PARTE***COMPLAINT in Admiralty against East Towing & Salvage, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6595989.), filed by East Towing & Salvage, Inc.. Service due by 12/17/2019,(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Towing & Salvage, Inc. v. Blue Ocean 1 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Towing & Salvage, Inc.
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ocean 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Hoyos-Aliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Hoyos Integrity Corp.
Represented By: Manolo T. Rodriguez-Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Hoyos Group Corp.
Represented By: Manolo T. Rodriguez-Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?