Puleo v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Puleo
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. and Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01893
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to allow Robert Shelquist to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680404) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to allow Shanon Carson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6681752) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to allow Michael Dell'Angelo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6681744) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/13/2019. (EES)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to allow Robert Shelton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680404) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #11 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/7/2019. (EES)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Cases by Robert Puleo (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 11/8/2019 edit text (gav).
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Brian Marty to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6672897) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Bohlman Brandon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6672883) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow John Barton Goplerud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6672800) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Robert Puleo Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/29/2019. (EES)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez on behalf of Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC (Del Nido-Rodriguez, Natalia)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/21/2019 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga on behalf of Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC Responses due by 11/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llach-Zuniga, Luis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Puleo upon Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/3/2019. (EES)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC, International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc., Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6602183.), filed by Robert Puleo. Service due by 12/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puleo v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Puleo
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brandon M. Bohlman
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condado Duo, La Concha, SPV, LLC
Represented By: Natalia Eugenia Del Nido-Rodriguez
Represented By: Luis Fernando Llach-Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?