Rivera v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamil Rivera
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. and International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01894
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Noted #25 Motion to Stay. Once motion to dismiss is filed a stay may be requested if warranted. At this time the court has not held its Rule 16 ISC. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/14/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting #23 Motion to Appear PHV ; Granting #24 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to allow Shanon Carson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6681785) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to allow Michael Dell'Angelo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6681764) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #22 Motion to allow Robert Shelton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680398).***FILED IN ERROR- Lacking PHV's Ink Signature. To be re-filed*** (gmm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 ***FILED IN ERROR-Lacking PHV's Ink Signature*** Motion to allow Robert Shelton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680398) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 11/13/2019 (gmm).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #17 Motion to Appear PHV ; Granting #18 Motion to Appear PHV ; Granting #19 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/7/2019. (AGF)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Related Cases by Jamil Rivera (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to allow Brian Marty to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6672985) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to allow Brandon Bohlman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6672979) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to allow John Barton Goplerud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6672932) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting as requested #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/6/2019. (AGF)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/5/2019 to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Jamil Rivera Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/04/2019. (CRH)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Noted as follows #11 Motion to Stay. The plaintiff may move to certify the purported class, however the Court will first address the motion to dismiss before any action is taken. Accordingly, plaintiff need not move to certify until then. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/29/2019. (AGF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Pending Adjudication of Motion to Dismiss filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judicial Notice filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A & 1B, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4A & 4B)(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting as requested #6 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/17/2019. (AGF)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement byInternational Hospitality Enterprises, Inc.. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until November 18, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. Responses due by 10/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamil Rivera upon International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc., Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6596794.), filed by Jamil Rivera. Service due by 12/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Hospitality Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Rivera
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Michael Dell'Angelo
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: John Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brandon M. Bohlman
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?