Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico v. Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico
Defendant: Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc. and Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01898
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 SURREPLY to #9 Response to Motion Re: #5 Motion to Remand, filed by Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. (Deliz, Juan) Modified on 11/15/2019 to edit docket relation (rom).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/12/2019. (EES)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Document Surreply filed by Juan Carlos Deliz on behalf of Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Deliz, Juan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Leave to File Reply in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico Re: #8 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc., Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc. filed by Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Cartaya-Brao, Jorge)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. Re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico filed by Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc.. (Deliz, Juan) Modified on 10/21/2019 edit text (gav).
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc. re #5 MOTION to Remand (Deliz, Juan) Modified on 10/11/2019 edit text (gav).
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez on behalf of Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. (Blasini-Gonzalez, Jorge)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand (Notice of Removal) by Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dept of State Domestic Corporation Certification, #2 Exhibit Dept of State Domestic Corp Certification)(Cartaya-Brao, Jorge) Modified on 10/7/2019 event (gav).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. re: #3 MOTION for Judgment Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc., Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Deliz, Juan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Judgment Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Juan Carlos Deliz on behalf of Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. Responses due by 10/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Deliz, Juan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, Superior Court San Juan, case number SJ2019CV08159. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6599125), filed by Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc., Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet)(Deliz, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico v. Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Liner Services Puerto Rico Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Deliz
Represented By: Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Puerto Rico Services Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Deliz
Represented By: Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comisionado de Seguros de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jorge A. Cartaya-Brao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?