Cintron-Carrasquillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Cintron Carrasquillo and David Cintron-Carrasquillo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01907
Filed: September 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Referring Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER as to #10 INFORMATIVE motion. Noted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 11/4/2019. (jjr)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Proof of Service filed by Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga on behalf of David Cintron-Carrasquillo Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, Certified mail receipts of Summons and Complaint sent to US Attorney General and Chief Counsel, Region II-Social Security Administration, #2 Exhibit II, Summons served to US Attorney)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo) Modified on 11/4/2019 to edit title (mcm).
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-1907(MEL). Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2019. (gr)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: Upon the parties' consent (Docket No. 5), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2019. (MPL)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Noting #5 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/30/2019. (EMJ)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding summons and complaint sent to US Attorney General and Chief Counsel, Region II-Social Security Administration via certified mail return receipts filed by Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga on behalf of David Cintron-Carrasquillo Responses due by 10/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipts of Summons and Complaint sent to US Attorney General and Chief Counsel, Region II-Social Security Administration)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Plaintiff shall inform the court not later than October 2, 2019 if he consents as well. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/23/2019.(EMJ)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6602461.), filed by David Cintron Carrasquillo. Service due by 12/23/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons summons of Social Security, #4 Summons summons of US Attorney General, #5 Summons summons of US District Attorney for the District of PR)(Pascual-Villaronga, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cintron-Carrasquillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cintron Carrasquillo
Represented By: Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cintron-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Ricardo Pascual-Villaronga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?