Seilhamer v. Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David L Seilhamer
Defendant: Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc., Does I-X and Guardian Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01910
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Vanessa Blanco-Mendez on behalf of Defendants Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc., Guardian Insurance Company, Inc..(Blanco-Mendez, Vanessa)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Entry of Default "Denied, the time for response has been extended to November 20, 2019." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/31/2019. (EES)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion for Entry of Default filed by Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc. Re: #6 MOTION for Default Entry as to Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc. filed by David L Seilhamer filed by Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc.. (Blanco-Mendez, Vanessa) Modified on 10/30/2019 edit text (gav).
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Entry as to Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc. filed by Felix A. Colon-Serrano on behalf of David L Seilhamer Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons returned executed - Triple S)(Colon-Serrano, Felix)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 11/20/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/29/2019. (EES)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/20/2019 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by David L Seilhamer filed by Vanessa Blanco-Mendez on behalf of Guardian Insurance Company, Inc. Responses due by 10/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Blanco-Mendez, Vanessa)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Vanessa Blanco-Mendez on behalf of Guardian Insurance Company, Inc. Responses due by 10/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Blanco-Mendez, Vanessa) Modified on 10/18/2019 event, document is not a motion (gav).
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc., Guardian Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (ad)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc., Does I-X, Guardian Insurance Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6603937.), filed by David L Seilhamer. Service due by 12/23/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Colon-Serrano, Felix)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seilhamer v. Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axtmayer Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Vanessa Blanco-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Vanessa Blanco-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L Seilhamer
Represented By: Felix A. Colon-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?