Versatech, Inc. v. Florida Caribbean Distillers, LLC.
Plaintiff: VERSATECH,INC. and Versatech, Inc.
Defendant: FLORIDA CARIBBEAN DISTILLERS, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01916
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FLORIDA CARIBBEAN DISTILLERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (Category Sheet) by VERSATECH,INC. re #1 Complaint (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/26/2019. (ad)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA CARIBBEAN DISTILLERS, LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6604833.), filed by VERSATECH,INC.. Service due by 12/23/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Versatech, Inc. v. Florida Caribbean Distillers, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERSATECH,INC.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versatech, Inc.
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA CARIBBEAN DISTILLERS, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?