Amezquita v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Edgar Arroyo Amezquita
Defendant: United States of America and Walter Woods
Interested Party: Staff Attorneys
Case Number: 3:2019cv01918
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00476. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 20, 2019 Case transferred to District of Puerto Rico; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Petitioner's #11 objections are OVERRULED; (2) The #10 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; and (3) This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico under 28 USC 1631. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/20/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #10 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico under 28 USC 1631; Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/4/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Response to Order re #2 and #6 Orders, by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: construing #7 Motion for Declaratory Relief as a motion for leave to file a motion for declaratory relief; ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Declaratory Relief. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/16/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Declaratory Relief by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita. (kh, ) Construed in the court's #8 Order as a MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Declaratory Relief on 8/16/2019 (wcl, ). [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the court's #2 Order, is amended to further advise Petitioner in compliance with Castro v. United States, 540 U.S. 375, 38283 (2003), that the re-characterization of his habeas petition as a motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 USC 2255 renders the 2255 motion and any subsequent 2255 motion subject to the procedural limitations imposed upon 2255 motions, in particular, the one-year limitation period and the successive-motion bar; further ORDERED the Petitioner is granted an extension to 8/9/2019, to inform the court if he wishes to do one of the following: (a) Continue to proceed only on the claims he presents in the construed 2255 motion; or (b) Amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his convictions and sentences; or (c) Withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/31/2019. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Objection and Notice of Appeal re #4 Order filed by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that Petitioner's objections (Doc. #3 ) are OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner is granted an extension from July 19, 2019, to and including August 2, 2019, to inform the court if he wishes to do one of the following: (a) continue to proceed only on the claims he presents in the construed 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion; or (b) amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his convictions and sentences; or (c) withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Keith Watkins on 7/16/2019. (kh, ) Modified on 7/31/2019 to clarify text to reflect correct Judge signature and association (qc/djy, ). [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Objections filed by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that: 1. The instant petition be construed as a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. 2. The United States of America shall henceforth be listed as the sole respondent in this case. 3. On or before July 19, 2019, Amezquita shall inform the court if he wishes to do one of the following: (a) Continue to proceed only on the claims he presents in the construed 2255 motion; or (b) Amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his convictions and sentences; or (c) Withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action. Amezquita is cautioned that if he fails to file a response in compliance with this order, which requires that he advise the court of his wishes to do one of the above options, this cause shall proceed as an action under 28 U.S.C. 2255, with the court considering only the claims presented in the construed 2255 motion (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/5/2019. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 3, 2019 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 (CONSTRUED AS A 2255 MOTION PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #2 ORDER) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edgar Arroyo Amezquita. (No Filing Fee; No IFP) (bes, ) Modified on 7/8/2019 (kh, ). [Transferred from almd on 9/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amezquita v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Staff Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Arroyo Amezquita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?