USA v. Funds in the amount of $53,082,824.19.00 in U.S. Currency, contained in the following accounts under the name of Banco San Juan International: (a) xxx-x7689 Merrill Lynch Address: #15 Secon
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $53,082,824.19.00 in U.S. Currency, contained in the following accounts under the name of Banco San Juan International: (a) xxx-x7689 Merrill Lynch Address: #15 Secon
Claimant: Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01930
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 49 Warrant in Rem Issued to arrest property as to Funds in the amount of $53,082,824.19.00 in U.S. Currency, contained in the following accounts under the name of Banco San Juan International: (a) xxx-x7689 Merrill Lynch Address: #15 Secon. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant In Rem) (rim)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Granting #47 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Docket entries 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 23, 24, 26 and 27." Response due by 11/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/28/2019. (LMR)
October 25, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Docket entries 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 23, 24, 26 and 27 until November 29, 2019 filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 11/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martorani-Dale, David)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Granting #43 "Banco San Juan Internacional's Motion to Restrict." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2019. (ebb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting #42 "Banco San Juan Internacional's Motion to Restrict." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2019. (ebb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Granting #41 "Banco San Juan Internacional's Motion to Restrict." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/18/2019. (ebb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Restrict Document - Motion to Treat this Matter as Related Case filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Restrict Document - Motion to Suppress filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Restrict Document - Motion to Lift Stay filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #25 "Banco San Juan Internacional's Motion to Restrict." The motion shall be refiled in strict compliance with Standing Order No. 9, specifying the parties to have access. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (ebb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #22 "Banco San Juan Internacional's Motion to Restrict." The motion shall be refiled in strict compliance with Standing Order No. 9, specifying the parties to have access. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (ebb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #16 "Banco San Juan Internacional's Motion to Restrict." The motion shall be refiled in strict compliance with Standing Order No. 9, specifying the parties to have access. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (ebb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The government shall respond to the motions filed at Docket Nos. #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , #23 , #24 , #26 , and #27 not later than 10/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting #31 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Granting #30 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #14 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/17/2019. (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting #13 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/15/2019. (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting #12 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (LMR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to allow Courtney Saleski to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 100067425) filed by Sonia I. Torres-Pabon on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to allow Jonathan W. Haray to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 100067425) filed by Sonia I. Torres-Pabon on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Noting #28 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/11/2019. (ebb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia I. Torres-Pabon on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. (Torres-Pabon, Sonia)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Treat this Matter as Related Case - REDACTEDCTED filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to Treat this Matter as Related Case filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., USA Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Restrict Document (Motion to Treat this Matter as Related Case) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Hearing - Suppression - REDACTED filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION for Hearing - Suppression filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc., USA Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Restrict Document (Motion to Suppress) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Compliance with 5th and 6th Amendments filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to the 8th Amendment as to Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to lift stay - REDACTED - re 8 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MOTION to lift stay re 8 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Restrict Document (Motion to Lift Stay) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 CLAIM Verified by Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Christopher Man to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6630880) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Eric Bloom to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6630844) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Abbe David Lowell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6630820) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2019. (ebb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #4 "Motion Requesting Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in Rem and Seizure." See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2019. (ebb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting #5 "United States' Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings." This case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened if warranted, upon the conclusion of the ongoing criminal investigation. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2019. (ebb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #2 "United States of America's Motion to Restrict or Seal Unsworn Declaration." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2019. (ebb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Martorani-Dale, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION to Restrict Document - Unsworn Declaration by USA. (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document - Unsworn Declaration filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Funds in the amount of $53,082,824.19.00 in U.S. Currency, contained in the following accounts under the name of Banco San Juan International: (a) xxx-x7689 Merrill Lynch Address: #15 Secon, filed by USA. Service due by 12/26/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Martorani-Dale, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Funds in the amount of $53,082,824.19.00 in U.S. Currency, contained in the following accounts under the name of Banco San Juan International: (a) xxx-x7689 Merrill Lynch Address: #15 Secon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $53,082,824.19.00 in U.S. Currency, contained in the following accounts under the name of Banco San Juan International: (a) xxx-x7689 Merrill Lynch Address: #15 Secon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Banco San Juan Internacional, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Bloom
Represented By: Sonia I. Torres-Pabon
Represented By: Courtney Saleski
Represented By: Abbe David Lowell
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Represented By: Jonathan W. Haray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?