Belen-Garcia et al v. Banco Popular de PR
Plaintiff: Marelis Pacheco-Mercado and Antonio Belen-Garcia
Defendant: Banco Popular de PR
Case Number: 3:2019cv01938
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Roberto R. Blanes-Ibarra appointed to represent Plaintiff: Antonio Belen-Garcia (pro-se) re D.E. 9 Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/22/19. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Antonio Belen-Garcia & Counsel: Roberto R. Blanes-Ibarra, re 9 Order, Terminate Motions. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/21/19.(mg)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER noted #8 Motion In Compliance; granting #8 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall take notice and appoint new pro bono counsel, who shall confer with Plaintiffs and may file an amended complaint, if needed. Amended Complaint due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/21/2019. (MQ)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Motion In Compliance as to #6 Order,, MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Steven P. Lausell-Recurt filed by Steven P. Lausell-Recurt on behalf of Community Law Office, Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Lausell-Recurt, Steven)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. In light of the appointment of pro bono counsel, Docket No. #6 , the Court will grant leave to file an amended complaint, if needed. Amended Complaint due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/8/2019. (MQ)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Steven P. Lausell-Recurt, Esq. appointed to represent Plaintiffs: Antonio Belen-Garcia & Marelis Pacheco-Mercado (pro-se) re D.E. 5 Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/3/19. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiffs: Antonio Belen-Garcia & Marelis Pacheco-Mercado, & Counsel: Steven P. Lausell-Recurt, Esq., re 5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/3/19.(mg)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/3/2019. (MQ)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT in support of DE #3 Motion Requesting Counsel, by Antonio Belen-Garcia, Marelis Pacheco-Mercado, pro se. (mg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Antonio Belen-Garcia, Marelis Pacheco-Mercado, pro se. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antonio Belen-Garcia, Marelis Pacheco-Mercado, pro se. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 ***SELECTED PARTIES***COMPLAINT against Banco Popular de PR, filed by Antonio Belen-Garcia, Marelis Pacheco-Mercado, pro se. Service due by 12/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belen-Garcia et al v. Banco Popular de PR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Popular de PR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marelis Pacheco-Mercado
Represented By: Steven P. Lausell-Recurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Belen-Garcia
Represented By: Steven P. Lausell-Recurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?