United States of America v. Rivera-Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Gonzalez, Carmen Ana Gonzalez, Cesar Rivera Mendez, Maria Dolores Santiago de Rivera, Gloria Rodriguez Bernardo, Conjugal Partnership Rivera Rodriguez and Cesar Rivera Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01942
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Gloria Rodriguez-Bernardo. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Motion Submitting: NOTED. The Clerk will issue the summons. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (brc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting Summons filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 12/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gloria Rodriguez Bernardo)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Rivera Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Gonzalez, Carmen Ana Gonzalez, Cesar Rivera Gonzalez, Cesar Rivera Mendez, Maria Dolores Santiago de Rivera (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 1/2/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit $400,000 Note, #2 Exhibit $400,000 Note, #3 Exhibit Deed 141, #4 Exhibit Deed 141, #5 Exhibit Deed 152, #6 Exhibit Deed 152, #7 Exhibit Deed 125, #8 Exhibit Deed 125, #9 Exhibit Property 4,134, #10 Exhibit Property 13,154, #11 Exhibit COI, #12 Exhibit SCRA, #13 Summons Conjugal Partnership Rivera Gonzalez, #14 Summons Conjugal Partnership Rivera Rodriguez, #15 Summons Carmen Ana Gonzalez, #16 Summons Cesar Rivera Gonzalez, #17 Summons Cesar Rivera Mendez, #18 Summons Maria Dolores Santiago, #19 Category Sheet, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rivera-Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Ana Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Rivera Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Dolores Santiago de Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Rodriguez Bernardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rivera Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Rivera Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?