Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc. et al v. Tire Kingdom et al
Plaintiff: Crowley Caribbean Services, LLC and Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc.
Defendant: Tire Kingdom, Infinity Investors, LLC and Nedal Salem
Case Number: 3:2019cv01962
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting and Granting #8 "Informative Motion and for Extension of Time." If the case is not settled by 12/9/2019, defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/26/2019. (LMR)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Juan Carlos Deliz on behalf of Crowley Caribbean Services, LLC, Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc. Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Deliz, Juan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Infinity Investors, LLC by Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc., Crowley Caribbean Services, LLC upon Infinity Investors, LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Deliz, Juan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nedal Salem by Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc., Crowley Caribbean Services, LLC upon Nedal Salem served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Deliz, Juan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tire Kingdom by Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc., Crowley Caribbean Services, LLC upon Tire Kingdom served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Deliz, Juan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Infinity Investors, LLC, Nedal Salem, Tire Kingdom (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (vdm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Deliz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Deliz, Juan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6633155.), filed by Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc.. Service due by 1/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Blasini-Gonzalez, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc. et al v. Tire Kingdom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Kingdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nedal Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crowley Caribbean Services, LLC
Represented By: Juan Carlos Deliz
Represented By: Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crowley Puerto Rico Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jorge F. Blasini-Gonzalez
Represented By: Juan Carlos Deliz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?