Dominicci-Lucca v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: R Alvaro Dominicci-Lucca and Alvaro R. Dominicci-Lucca
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01969
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: This case is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 USC sec 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/30/2019. (AGF)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE Motion Informing by Alvaro R. Dominicci-Lucca. (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel) Modified on 10/31/2019 to remove restriction (gmm).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to comply with the courts order at Docket No. 6. He shall do so no later than October 30, 2019. Failure to comply with the same shall result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/28/2019. (AGF)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall comply with the Court's order at Docket No. 4 and inform by Wednesday October 23, 2019 whether he consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/21/2019. (AGF)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff shall inform by Friday October 18, 2019 whether he consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, which will expedite resolution of his appeal. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2019. (AGF)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6636252.) re #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by R Alvaro Dominicci-Lucca, filed by R Alvaro Dominicci-Lucca. Related document: #1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT, filed by R Alvaro Dominicci-Lucca.(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by R Alvaro Dominicci-Lucca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney Gen, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Social Security, #6 Appendix No Change of Address)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominicci-Lucca v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Alvaro Dominicci-Lucca
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro R. Dominicci-Lucca
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?