MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Ayala-De Jesus
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Defendant: Isia Yadira Ayaka de Jesus and Isia Yadira Ayala-De Jesus
Case Number: 3:2019cv01973
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/20/2019. (brc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano on behalf of MTGLQ Investors, L.P. Responses due by 12/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit SCRA)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P. upon Isia Yadira Ayala-De Jesus served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Isia Yadira Ayala-De Jesus (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Isia Yadira Ayaka de Jesus ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6638075.), filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. Service due by 1/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Exhibit Modification Deed, #3 Exhibit Payment Reduction Plan, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Ayala-De Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Represented By: Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isia Yadira Ayaka de Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isia Yadira Ayala-De Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?