Acevedo-Garcia et al v. Sistema de Salud San Carlos Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marisol Acevedo, Freddie Acevedo, Raul Acevedo, Freddie Acevedo-Mendez, Marisol Acevedo-Mendez and Raul Acevedo-Garcia
Defendant: Dr. Mirelis Miranda, Sistema de Salud San Carlos Inc., Dr. Zaydalee Cardona, Triple S Propiedad Inc., Dr. Javier Marquez, Hospital San Carlos Borromeo and Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02002
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 INFORMATIVE motion. Noted. However, counsel is responsible for any filings or matters that may arise during his absence. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/17/2019. (wm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Vacation of Counsel filed by Jaime F. Agrait-Llado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Agrait-Llado, Jaime)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dr. Zaydalee Cardona, Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc., Dr. Javier Marquez, Dr. Mirelis Miranda, Sistema de Salud San Carlos Inc., Triple S Propiedad Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons Hospital San Carlos, #2 Summons Dr. Cardona, #3 Summons Dr. Marquez, #4 Summons Dr. Miranda, #5 Summons Sistema Salud San Carlos, #6 Summons Triple S Propiedad) (Agrait-Llado, Jaime)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (rim)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Freddie Acevedo, Marisol Acevedo, Raul Acevedo.(Agrait-Llado, Jaime)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6648974.), filed by Freddie Acevedo, Marisol Acevedo, Raul Acevedo. Service due by 1/20/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initial Documents, #2 Exhibit Expert Witness Report)(Agrait-Llado, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo-Garcia et al v. Sistema de Salud San Carlos Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mirelis Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sistema de Salud San Carlos Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Zaydalee Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple S Propiedad Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Javier Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital San Carlos Borromeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Acevedo
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Acevedo
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Acevedo
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Acevedo-Mendez
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Acevedo-Mendez
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Acevedo-Garcia
Represented By: Jaime F. Agrait-Llado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?