Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America v. Vega-Bermudez et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Defendant: ED Contractors USA, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Existing Between Edgardo Vega and Virgen Gonzalez, Virgen Gonzalez, Edgardo Vega, ED Contractors, Inc., Conjugal Partnership Vega-Gonzalez, Virgen M. Gonzalez-Vazquez and Edgardo J. Vega-Bermudez
Case Number: 3:2019cv02017
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement byTravelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Pamela Perez-Caballero on behalf of Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America (Perez-Caballero, Alicia)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ED Contractors USA, Inc., ED Contractors, Inc., Virgen Gonzalez, Edgardo Vega (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet) (Steffens-Guzman, Carlos) Modified on 10/28/2019 to edit docket title (rom).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6656235.), filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Service due by 1/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted GAI, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bonds, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted UCC Statement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Walsh notice of default, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demand for collateral, #6 Exhibit 6 - Translated Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6(a) - Original Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7 - Letter dated 7-20-19, #9 Exhibit 8 - Books and Records request, #10 Exhibit 9 - Email dated 7/10/19, #11 Exhibit 10 - Email dated 7/12/19)(Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America v. Vega-Bermudez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED Contractors USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Existing Between Edgardo Vega and Virgen Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgen Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Vega-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgen M. Gonzalez-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo J. Vega-Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman
Represented By: Alicia Pamela Perez-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?