PowerSecure, Inc. v. Municipality of Aibonito
Plaintiff: PowerSecure, Inc.
Defendant: Municipality of Aibonito
Case Number: 3:2019cv02031
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendant. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/20/2019. (CRH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PowerSecure, Inc. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noted #8 Informative Motion Regarding Certified Translations of Documents In Support of Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (CRH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion Regarding Certified Translations of Documents In Support of Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (DKT. 1) filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of PowerSecure, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos) Modified on 11/13/2019 to replace Caps (gmm).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translations due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/4/2019. (MET)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Municipality of Aibonito. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. (rim)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz on behalf of PowerSecure, Inc. Responses due by 11/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPowerSecure, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Southern PowerSecure Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Southern Company for PowerSecure, Inc... (Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PowerSecure, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6662013.), filed by PowerSecure, Inc.. Service due by 1/28/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Contract Award, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Scope of Work, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Contract Action Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Ordinance No. 7, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-ECA Gen Contrac v Mun de Mayaguez, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Act 50-2018, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7-2019 09 20 Municipality letter, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8-2019 10 01 Response Letter to Aibonito, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9-2019 10 10 Preliminary Ruling, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Sheet, #12 Summons)(Rivera-Ortiz, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PowerSecure, Inc. v. Municipality of Aibonito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PowerSecure, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos R. Rivera-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Aibonito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?