Metropolitan Surgical Corp v. Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Surgical Corp
Defendant: QBE Seguros, Banco Popular Puerto Rico and Small Business Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv02033
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal (Docket No. 19), the Court hereby DISMISSES the instant action WITHOUT PREJUDICE in compliance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/20/2019. (MES)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER noted #31 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/20/2019. (MES)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER noted #27 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/20/2019. (MES)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 Motion In Compliance with Order#30 filed by Noelia Perez-Garcia on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Garcia, Noelia)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico is to file a motion no later than December 20, 2019 declaring their position as to Plaintiff's request for dismissal. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/16/2019.(MES)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER noted #26 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/16/2019. (MES)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER finding as moot #24 Motion for extension of time; finding as moot #25 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/16/2019. (MES)
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 Motion In Compliance with Order Docket 20 filed by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla on behalf of Metropolitan Surgical Corp Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Judgement)(Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro) Modified on 12/17/2019 edit text (gav).
December 16, 2019 Filing 26 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Motion In Compliance with Order Docket 23 filed by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla on behalf of Metropolitan Surgical Corp Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Loss, #2 Exhibit Proof of Loss)(Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro) Modified on 12/17/2019 edit text (gav).
December 14, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for extension of time until 12/27/2019 to Submit Proposed Judgement filed by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla on behalf of Metropolitan Surgical Corp Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro)
December 12, 2019 Filing 24 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for extension of time until 12/27/2019 to Submit Proposed Judgement filed by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla on behalf of Metropolitan Surgical Corp Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion requesting Order. Plaintiff is ordered to file the Settlement Agreement before the Court in restricted manner for parties to view only no later than December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/9/2019. (MES)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION requesting Order filed by Pedro J. Lopez-Bergollo on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lopez-Bergollo, Pedro)
December 9, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate filing as in D.E. #18 (gav)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/9/2019. (MES)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Plaintiff to submit Proposed Judgment in relation to docket no. 19 no later than December 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/9/2019.(MES)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Metropolitan Surgical Corp (Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla on behalf of Metropolitan Surgical Corp (Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro) Modified on 12/9/2019 remove restriction (gav).
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate filing as in D.E. #18 *** MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Alejandro Garcia-Padilla on behalf of Metropolitan Surgical Corp Responses due by 12/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Padilla, Alejandro) Modified on 12/9/2019 (gav).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for extension of time. Answer deadline due by December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/20/2019. (MES)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time until 12/20/2019 to File Responsive Pleading filed by Noelia Perez-Garcia on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Garcia, Noelia)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff has until December 2, 2019 to announce the Court who will assume its legal representation in the instant federal case. Defendants are ordered to notify this Order to Attorney Magdaliz Reyes Berries, who was local counsel for the Plaintiff, so she in turn can notify Metropolitan Surgical Corp. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/5/2019. (MES)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER noted #5 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/5/2019. (MES)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by December 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/5/2019. (MES)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER noted #6 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/5/2019. (MES)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/5/2019. (MES)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Noelia Perez-Garcia on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico (Perez-Garcia, Noelia)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Abesada-Aguet on behalf of Banco Popular Puerto Rico (Abesada-Aguet, Roberto)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (vdm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Small Business Administration filed by Pedro J. Lopez-Bergollo on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Bergollo, Pedro)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defective Filing Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Small Business Administration filed by Pedro J. Lopez-Bergollo on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Bergollo, Pedro)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) was signed in the wrong line and filing fee has not been received.Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/4/2019. (vdm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/30/19 to File Answer or Plead filed by Pedro J. Lopez-Bergollo on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Bergollo, Pedro)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2019 to file translations filed by Pedro J. Lopez-Bergollo on behalf of Small Business Administration Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Bergollo, Pedro)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance-Arecibo, case number MT2018CV00803. (), filed by Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez-Bergollo, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Surgical Corp v. Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Seguros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Popular Puerto Rico
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Represented By: Noelia Perez-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Pedro J. Lopez-Bergollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Surgical Corp
Represented By: Alejandro Garcia-Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?