MCS Advantage, Inc. et al v. MMM Healthcare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MCS Advantage, Inc. and MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, Island Medical Group Corp., East Coast Medical Services, Inc., Grupo Mdico Geritrico de Puerto Rico, Inc., Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC, InSalud, Inc., Comprehensive Geriatric Care of San Juan, Inc., John Doe, John Roe, Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc. and Company ABC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02035
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER noted and granted #108 Motion submitting. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on January 30, 2020. (McGiverin, Bruce)
January 20, 2020 Filing 131 Island Medical Group, Corp.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint, filed by Francisco J. Mercado-Olivero on behalf of Defendant Island Medical Group Corp..(Mercado-Olivero, Francisco)
January 17, 2020 Filing 130 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint, filed by Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo on behalf of Defendants InSalud, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc..(Bolanos-Lugo, Katiuska)
January 17, 2020 Filing 129 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint, , AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Plaintiffs MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC, Counter Defendants MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 1/21/2020 to correct title (gmm).
January 17, 2020 Filing 128 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint, filed by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of Defendant East Coast Medical Services, Inc..(Alcover-Acosta, Cesar)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The Court hereby REFERS #108 Joint Motion Submitting Errata Sheet to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/16/2020. (CRH)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: Noted #119 Motion submitting Certified English Translation. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/16/2020. (CRH)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: Granting #118 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translations due February 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/16/2020. (CRH)
January 15, 2020 Filing 124 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Comprehensive Geriatric Care of San Juan, Inc. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
January 14, 2020 Filing 123 Summons Issued as to Comprehensive Geriatric Care of San Juan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
January 14, 2020 Filing 122 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Re: #98 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: Granting #120 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/14/2020. (AGF)
January 13, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Sur-Reply) filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Responses due by 1/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Sur-Reply Brief)(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translation re: #117 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC, #118 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 1/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified English Translation)(Related document(s) #117 , #118 ) (Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
January 7, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jordan A. Feirman on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 1/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Feirman, Jordan)
January 7, 2020 Filing 117 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiff's #98 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Feirman, Jordan) Modified on 1/9/2020 to edit title (gmm).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Leave to File; granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' #115 request for leave to file a sur-reply is denied without prejudice, insofar as neither defendants nor the court at this time know whether a sur-reply is necessary. The parties are reminded that a reply and sur-reply should not be used to re-hash old arguments or to simply try to get the last word. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on December 30, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
December 27, 2019 Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Re: #113 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply MOTION for Extension of Time until January 7, 2020 to File Response/Reply filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The Court hereby REFERS #113 Motion for Leave to File Document Reply, Motion for Extension of Time until January 7, 2020 to File Response/Reply to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/27/2019. (CRH)
December 26, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply, MOTION for Extension of Time until January 7, 2020 to File Response/Reply filed by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 1/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Noted #108 Motion submitting Errata Sheet. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2019. (CRH)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The Court hereby REFERS #98 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for Report and Recommendation and hearing, if warranted. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2019. (CRH)
December 26, 2019 Filing 110 JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING without prejudice Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc. (GMG). Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2019. (CRH)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Noted #106 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2019. (CRH)
December 26, 2019 Filing 108 Joint MOTION Submitting Errata Sheet filed by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC., MMM Holdings, LLC., MMM Healthcare, LLC., Castellana Physician Services, LLC. Responses due by 1/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit A - Errata)(Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro) Modified on 12/27/2019 to add filers (gmm).
December 20, 2019 Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Castellana Physician Services, LLC, Company ABC, John Doe, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, John Roe, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., Comprehensive Geriatric Care of San Juan, Inc., filed by MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons)(Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
December 20, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
December 20, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Re: #98 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: Adopting Report and Recommendation re #94 Report and Recommendation; Denying #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/19/2019. (CRH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 103 Transcript of Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/27/2019, before Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bo Vazquetelles, Telephone number 787-525-3487. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (be)
December 17, 2019 Filing 102 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/26/2019, before Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bo Vazquetelles, Telephone number 787-525-3487. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/7/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (be)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Granting as requested #99 Consent Motion for Extension of Time Until December 20, 2019 to Amend Complaint as a Matter of Course and Proposing Agreed Schedule to Respond to Same. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/10/2019. (CRH)
December 9, 2019 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. Re: #97 Objection to Report and Recommendation, filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc.. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 99 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2019 to Amend COMPLAINT AS A MATTER OF COURSE AND PROPOSING AGREED SCHEDULE TO RESPOND TO SAME Re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
December 6, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
December 6, 2019 Filing 97 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Re: #94 Report and Recommendation, filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 7, 2019 Letter)(Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
December 4, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 62.00, receipt number PRX100068545. (RE: CD REQUEST/DKT90) (rim)
December 4, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 31.00, receipt number PRX100068535. (RE: CD REQUEST/DKT91) (rim)
December 3, 2019 Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #77 MOTION requesting Order to Declare as Moot the Preliminary Injunction Motion; #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. After consulting with the presiding district judge, the time period for filing Objections to R&R shortened to: 12/6/2019.Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on December 3, 2019.(McGiverin, Bruce)
November 27, 2019 Filing 96 DEFENDANT'S Exhibit List re Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (bgl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 95 PLAINTIFF'S Exhibit List re Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (bgl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/27/2019. Testimony of Herminio Nieves-Blasini heard on behalf of plaintiff. Testimony of Roberto Pando heard on behalf of defendant. Exhibits Admitted: Plaintiff's 5-8, 23-24, 37. Defendant's I-K, X, Z. (Court Reporter DCR/ Courtroom 9.) (bgl)
November 27, 2019 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Castellana Physician Services, LLC for proceedings held on 11/26/19-11/27/19 before Judge McGiverin.. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST filed by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro) Modified on 12/2/2019 to correct title (gmm).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Granting as requested #85 Motion for extension of time until December 26, 2019 to answer Verified Complaint or otherwise plead filed; Granting as requested #88 Motion for Extension of Time until December 18, 2019 to File Answer to the Verified Complaint or Otherwise Plead. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/27/2019. (CRH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 88 First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2019 to File Answer to the Verified Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo on behalf of InSalud, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 12/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bolanos-Lugo, Katiuska)
November 27, 2019 Filing 87 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc.. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 12/2/2019 to add docket relationship (gmm).
November 26, 2019 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 11/26/2019. Testimonies of Maite Morales-Martinez, Dr. Ines Hernandez-Roses, Richard Luna-Padro and Lara Montilla heard on behalf of plaintiffs. Testimony of Lara Montilla also heard on behalf of defendant. Exhibits admitted: Plaintiff's 12-14, 18, 22, 25, 27-30, 33-36. Defendant's A, D, E, G-1, G-2, H, L-N, Q-R, U-V. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 11/27/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. (Court Reporter DCR/ Courtroom 9.) (bgl)
November 26, 2019 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Luna, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Maite Morales, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Herminio Nieves, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Ines Hernandez, MD, #5 Exhibit Reply Ex. 1 - Letter of 10-29-2019, #6 Exhibit Reply Ex. 2 - Letter of 10-31-2019, #7 Exhibit Reply Ex. 3 - MMM Website)(Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro) Modified on 12/2/2019 to correct docket relationship (gmm).
November 26, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for extension of time until December 26, 2019 to answer Verified Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso on behalf of Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cordova-Ayuso, Lucas)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Noted #83 Notice of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/26/2019. (CRH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
November 25, 2019 Filing 82 Joint STIPULATION OF FACTS by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC., Castellana Physicians Services, LLC., InSalud, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC., Island Medical Group Corp., East Coast Medical Services, Inc., Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., Grupo Mdico Geritrico De Puerto Rico, Inc. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add filers and edit title (gmm)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #74 MOTION to Strike ; #77 MOTION requesting Order ; #80 MOTION for extension of time REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for extension of time until December 26, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of East Coast Medical Services, Inc. Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loubriel, Carla)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 25, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 25, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 25, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION requesting Order to Declare as Moot the Preliminary Injunction Motion, MOTION to Set Aside as Moot the November 26th Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of East Coast Medical Services, Inc. Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loubriel, Carla)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 25, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Granting #47 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Strike Re: #50 MOTION for Leave to File Document TENDERED REPLY TO THE DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION AT DOCKET NO. 19 AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #50 ) (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #63 MOTION requesting Order REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #50 MOTION for Leave to File Document REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Granting #51 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Translations due on or before December 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Noted #56 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Tendered Sur-Reply)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Noted #62 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Re: #63 MOTION requesting Order filed by MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: Noted #65 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/25/2019. (AGF)
November 22, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket No. 50-4, #2 Exhibit Docket No. 50-6, #3 Exhibit Docket No. 50-8(p. 6-16))(Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 22, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of East Coast Medical Services, Inc. (Loubriel, Carla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION requesting Order filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 21, 2019 Filing 62 Joint Motion In Compliance as to 46 Order,, 43 Order,, filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 46 , 43 ) (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 11/22/2019 t add filers (gmm).
November 21, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Villa los Santos Advantage, Inc. by Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo on behalf of Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. (Bolanos-Lugo, Katiuska)
November 21, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of InSalud, Inc. by Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo on behalf of InSalud, Inc. (Bolanos-Lugo, Katiuska)
November 21, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of PHM Multisalud, LLC by Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo on behalf of PHM Multisalud, LLC (Bolanos-Lugo, Katiuska)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Noted #53 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/21/2019. (AGF)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #55 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/21/2019. (AGF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #19 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., InSalud, Inc. filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Certified Translation Dkt. 19-6, #2 Certified Translation Dkt. 19-18, #3 Certified Translation Dkt. 19-15, #4 Certified Translation Dkt. 19-16, #5 Certified Translation Dkt. 19-20)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against MCS Advantage, Inc. , MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Defendants MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel) Modified on 11/21/2019 to correct counterclaim information (gmm).
November 20, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Continue. Preliminary injunction hearing reset for November 26, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. Joint stipulation of facts due at 5:00 p.m. the day prior. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 20, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 19, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Document tendered Reply to the defendant's opposition at Docket #19 and to exceed page limitation filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Richard Luna, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Richard Luna Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Richard Luna Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Richard Luna Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibt 4 to Richard Luna Declaration, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Mait Morales, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Herminio Nieves, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Ines Hernandez, MD, #10 Exhibit Reply Ex. 1- Letter of 10-29-2019, #11 Exhibit Reply Ex. 2-Letter of 10-31-2019, #12 Exhibit Reply Ex. 3-MMM Website)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla) Modified on 11/20/2019 to replace Caps (gmm).
November 19, 2019 Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 12/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 11/20/2019 to add filers (gmm).
November 19, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications. by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
November 19, 2019 Filing 47 Motion to allow HANNAH MAREK to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6687854) filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 12/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Given the undersigneds congested criminal docket, as well as his duties as chief judge, the parties are strongly encouraged to consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. This will expedite the resolution/settlement of the case, as well as save the parties time and money. Parties shall inform the Court via joint motion on or before November 21, 2019 if they jointly consent to do so. The same shall simply indicate whether consent is provided or not. The parties shall certify they have shown and discussed this order with their respective clients. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/18/2019. (AGF)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting #44 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/18/2019. (AGF)
November 18, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw Legal Representation filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: By 11/19/19, the parties shall exchange all exhibits they intend to introduce as evidence at a preliminary injunction hearing, and a list of all persons they intend to call as witnesses. The court will not consider the testimony of any witness, or any exhibit, not timely disclosed. Counsel for the parties shall meet IN PERSON by 11/20/19 to try to settle this case. If no settlement is reached, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of facts by 11/21/19 at 5:00 p.m. Preliminary injunction hearing set for November 22, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. So ordered.Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 18, 2019.(McGiverin, Bruce)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Noted #41 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/18/2019. (AGF)
November 15, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Joinder Re: #19 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., InSalud, Inc. filed by Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso on behalf of Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Cordova-Ayuso, Lucas) Modified on 11/21/2019 to remove restriction inadvertently placed by counsel (gmm).
November 15, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Island Medical Group Corp. Re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Island Medical Group Corp.. (Mercado-Olivero, Francisco)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Granting as requested #38 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/15/2019. (AGF)
November 14, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for extension of time until November 15, 2019 to file response to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed by Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso on behalf of Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cordova-Ayuso, Lucas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Joinder filed by East Coast Medical Services, Inc. Re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by East Coast Medical Services, Inc.. (Alcover-Acosta, Cesar) Modified on 11/21/2019 to edit docket relationship (gmm).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting #29 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Noted #31 Motion for Disclosure ; Noted #32 Motion for Disclosure ; Noted #33 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct Clerical Mistake Re: #19 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., InSalud, Inc. filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Disclosure Corporate Statement filed by Charles Bimbela on behalf of Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bimbela, Charles)
November 13, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Disclosure Corporate Statement filed by Charles Bimbela on behalf of InSalud, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bimbela, Charles)
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Disclosure Corporate Statement filed by Charles Bimbela on behalf of PHM Multisalud, LLC Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bimbela, Charles)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting #27 Motion to Appear PHV; Granting #28 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Filing 29 Motion to allow Tiffany Woo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680265) filed by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Sola, Arturo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 Motion to allow Brendan O'Rourke to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680258) filed by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Sola, Arturo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to allow Jeffrey Warshafsky to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6680231) filed by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC, MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Sola, Arturo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin for Report and Recommendation, and any hearing if necessary. The parties are advised that the Court will shorten the period of submitting objections to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting until November 15, 2019 #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Granting as requested #21 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting as requested #17 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/13/2019. (AGF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until November 18, 2019 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction filed by Francisco J. Mercado-Olivero on behalf of Island Medical Group Corp. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Olivero, Francisco) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit title (gmm).
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Castellana Physician Services, LLC, InSalud, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCastellana Physician Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MMM Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent InnovaCare Health, Inc. for Castellana Physician Services, LLC.. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, InSalud, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. Re: #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC filed by Castellana Physician Services, LLC, InSalud, Inc., PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lara Montilla-Byrne, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for extension of time filed by Defendant ECMS filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Re: #17 MOTION for extension of time until November 15, 2019 to Oppose Plaintiffs' Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by East Coast Medical Services, Inc. filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for extension of time until November 15, 2019 to Oppose Plaintiffs' Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of East Coast Medical Services, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Alcover-Acosta, Cesar) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit title (gmm).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noted #15 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/7/2019. (AGF)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Certifying Compliance with Order filed by Adrian Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Process)(Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc..(Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Denying #12 Motion for TRO. Plaintiffs shall serve process as well as copy of all pleadings and orders in this case to defendants, who in turn shall have seven (7) calendar days thereupon to show cause as to why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/5/2019. (AGF)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/4/2019. (AGF)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Jordan A. Feirman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6665996) filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 Motion to allow Jordan A. Feirman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6665996). ***FILED IN ERROR-Missing PHV's ink signature. Counsel to re-file*** (gmm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Castellana Physician Services, LLC, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., Grupo Mdico Geritrico de Puerto Rico, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (vdm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint,,, filed by MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC (Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR-MISSING PHV'S SIGNATURE*** Motion to allow Jordan A. Feirman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6665996) filed by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Garcia-Benitez, Carla) Modified on 11/4/2019 (gmm).
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) has not been signed. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/4/2019. (vdm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance - Notice of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications by Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC (Candelaria-Serrano, Jorge)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance - Notice of Appearance and Request to Receive Notifications by Carla Garcia-Benitez on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc., MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC (Garcia-Benitez, Carla)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Castellana Physician Services, LLC, East Coast Medical Services, Inc., Grupo Mdico Geritrico de Puerto Rico, Inc., InSalud, Inc., Island Medical Group Corp., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MMM Holdings, LLC, PHM Multisalud, LLC, Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc., filed by MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc.. Service due by 1/29/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Supplement Disclosure Statement)(Sanchez-Pagan, Adrian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCS Advantage, Inc. et al v. MMM Healthcare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castellana Physician Services, LLC
Represented By: Tiffany M. Woo
Represented By: Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMM Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tiffany M. Woo
Represented By: Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Warshafsky
Represented By: Brendan J. O'Rouke
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMM Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Tiffany M. Woo
Represented By: Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Warshafsky
Represented By: Brendan J. O'Rouke
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Medical Group Corp.
Represented By: Francisco J. Mercado-Olivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Mdico Geritrico de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villa Los Santos Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bimbela
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHM Multisalud, LLC
Represented By: Charles Bimbela
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InSalud, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bimbela
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Geriatric Care of San Juan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Medico Geriatrico de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas A. Cordova-Ayuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCS Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Adrian Sanchez-Pagan
Represented By: Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez
Represented By: Jordan A. Feirman
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Hannah M. Marek
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCS Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Adrian Sanchez-Pagan
Represented By: Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez
Represented By: Jordan A. Feirman
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Hannah M. Marek
Represented By: Jorge A. Candelaria-Serrano
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?