Vazquez Ocasio et al v. Mimoso-Nunez et al
Plaintiff: Jackeline Vazquez Ocasio, Miguel Angel Alvarado-Casanova and Jackeline Vazquez-Ocasio
Defendant: Dr. Jose J. Mimoso-Nunez, Conjugal Partnership Mimoso Munoz, Carmen J Munoz-Diaz, Unknown Insurance Companies A thru H, John Does 1 thru 3, A, B and C Corporations and Conjugal Partnership Mimoso-Munoz
Case Number: 3:2019cv02049
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Defendants will appear through counsel no later than January 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/27/2019. (brc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carmen J. Munoz-Diaz, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rom)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Mimoso-Munoz served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019; Jose J. Mimoso-Nunez served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019; Carmen J Munoz-Diaz served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Efron, David) Modified on 11/14/2019 to correct dates of service (ab).
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet (Efron, David)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Mimoso Munoz, Jose J. Mimoso-Nunez, Carmen J Munoz-Diaz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (vdm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6674634.), filed by Miguel Angel Alvarado-Casanova, Jackeline Vazquez Ocasio. Service due by 2/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons 1, #4 Summons 2, #5 Summons 3)(Efron, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez Ocasio et al v. Mimoso-Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jose J. Mimoso-Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Mimoso Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen J Munoz-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies A thru H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 thru 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B and C Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Mimoso-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackeline Vazquez Ocasio
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Alvarado-Casanova
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackeline Vazquez-Ocasio
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?