Rodriguez-Torres v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Josey Ann Rodriguez Torres and Josey Ann Rodriguez-Torres
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company and Transamerica Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02061
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER noted #6 Motion Submitting Certified Translations. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 12/3/2019. (RIF)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: 5 Order, filed by Mariana Muniz-Lara on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Co. Responses due by 12/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Translation Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Translation State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit 3 Translation Motion Informing Notice of Removal to State Court)(Related document(s) 5 ) (Muniz-Lara, Mariana)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Certified English translations of all Spanish-language documents submitted to this Court shall be filed no later than November 27, 2019, or said documents shall be stricken from the record. See 48 U.S.C. 864; Local Rule 5(g). Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 11/22/2019.(RIF)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mariana Muniz-Lara on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Co. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - notification San Juan, #2 Exhibit 2 - notification Plaintiff)(Muniz-Lara, Mariana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byTransamerica Life Insurance Co.. (Muniz-Lara, Mariana)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Court of First Instance, San Juan, case number SJ2019CV08421. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6677677), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A2 Amended Complaint Translation, #3 Exhibit B Envelope Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C State Court Docket - Confidential Notice, #5 Exhibit D Unsworn Declaration Gerardo Puig, #6 Exhibit E Mass Mutual Q2 2019 Statement, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #8 Category Sheet Category)(Muniz-Lara, Mariana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Torres v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Mariana Muniz-Lara
Represented By: Janine M. Guzman-Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josey Ann Rodriguez Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josey Ann Rodriguez-Torres
Represented By: Josey Ann Rodriguez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?