Alvarado-Cosme v. USA
Petitioner: Orlando Alvarado-Cosme
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv02082
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Referring Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/3/2020. (mrr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 3, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 15-217) filed by Orlando Alvarado-Cosme filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 1/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bauza, Mariana)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. This case has been directly assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach, as it is related to case 15-cr-217-01 (RAM) which was randomly assigned to Judge Arias-Marxuach by Order of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2020. (nat)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: USA shall respond by 1/2/2020 to the #1 pro se Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 15-217) filed by petitioner Orlando Alvarado Cosme. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 11/27/2019. (mld)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 15-217) filed by Orlando Alvarado-Cosme, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Argument & Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(arg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado-Cosme v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Orlando Alvarado-Cosme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?