Rodriguez-Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria D Rodriguez-Hernandez and Maria D. Rodriguez-Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv02119
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 4), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Camiille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings and entry of a final judgment. All pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 19-2119 (CVR). Judge Arias-Marxuach is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 01/24/2020. (gr)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Given plaintiff's consent (Docket No. 1-6), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 1/24/2020. (mrr)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
December 7, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6710918.), filed by Maria D Rodriguez-Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney Gen, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Social Security, #6 Appendix Consent Form, #7 Appendix No Change Address)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D Rodriguez-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D. Rodriguez-Hernandez
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?