Bautista Cayman Asset Company v. Lopez-Burgos
Plaintiff: Bautista Cayman Asset Company
Defendant: Julio Lopez-Burgos a/k/a Julio Manuel Lopez-Burgos, Martina Oquendo-Morales, Julio Lopez-Burgos and Julissa Lopez-Oquendo
Case Number: 3:2019cv02136
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company upon Martina Oquendo-Morales served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis) Modified on 2/6/2020 as to date of service and answer due date (gav).
February 5, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company upon Julissa Lopez-Oquendo served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Julissa Lopez-Oquendo, Martina Oquendo-Morales (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint by Bautista Cayman Asset Company re #12 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - UNSWORN STATEMENT UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY - Julio Lopez Burgos - NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT) (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis) Modified on 1/22/2020 edit text (gav).
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Julio Lopez-Burgos a/k/a Julio Manuel Lopez-Burgos, Martina Oquendo-Morales, filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LOAN AGREEMENT - JULIO LOPEZ BURGOS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Promissory Note A, #3 Exhibit 3 - Promissory Note B, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mortgage Note, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mortgage Deed, #6 Exhibit 6 - Modification Deed, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pledge Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Assignment of Leases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Default - Julio Lpez Burgos, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Default - Julio Lpez Burgos, #11 Summons Amended Complaint - Julissa Lopez Oquendo, #12 Summons Amended Complaint - Martina Oquendo Morales, #13 Text of Proposed Order of Interpellation in eure - Estate of Julio Lopez Burgos)(Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16,2020 to file Certified English Translations filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company. Certified Translations due by 1/16/2020.Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/9/2020.(PMA)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER noted #9 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/9/2020. (PMA)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16,2020 to file Certified English Translations filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company filed by Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 1/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LOAN Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - PROMISSORY NOTE A, #3 Exhibit 3 - PROMISSORY NOTE B, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mortgage Note, #5 Exhibit 6 - Modification Deed #30, #6 Exhibit 7 - PLEDGE Agreement, #7 Exhibit 8 - Assignment of Lease)(Related document(s) #2 , #1 ) (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company upon Martina Oquendo-Morales served on 12/22/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis) Modified on 1/2/2020 as to date of service and answer due date (gav).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPY. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATION WITH STAFF. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Julio Lopez-Burgos a/k/a Julio Manuel Lopez-Burgos, Martina Oquendo-Morales (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and, MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16,2020 to file Certified English Translations filed by Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 1/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Collection of Monies, Execution of Pledge and Foreclosure of Mortgage against Julio Lopez-Burgos a/k/a Julio Manuel Lopez-Burgos, Martina Oquendo-Morales ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6723800.), filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company. Service due by 3/16/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LOAN AGREEMENT - JULIO LOPEZ BURGOS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Promissory Note A, #3 Exhibit 3 - Promissory Note B, #4 Exhibit 4 - Mortgage Note, #5 Exhibit 5 - Mortgage Deed, #6 Exhibit 6 - Modification Deed, #7 Exhibit 7 - Pledge Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Assignment of Leases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Default - Julio Lpez Burgos (Address #1) 1943.641_11182019, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Default - Julio Lpez Burgos (Address #2) 1943.641_11182019, #11 Summons JULIO LOPEZ BURGOS, #12 Summons MARTINA OQUENDO MORALES, #13 Category Sheet, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parrilla-Hernandez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista Cayman Asset Company v. Lopez-Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bautista Cayman Asset Company
Represented By: Luis G. Parrilla-Hernandez
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Lopez-Burgos a/k/a Julio Manuel Lopez-Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martina Oquendo-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Lopez-Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julissa Lopez-Oquendo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?