Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. v. Unidad Laboral de Enfermeras(os) y Empleados de la Salud (ULEES)
Petitioner: Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc.
Respondent: Unidad Laboral de Enfermeras(os) y Empleados de la Salud (ULEES)
Case Number: 3:2019cv02148
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo Figueroa-Navarro on behalf of Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. (Figueroa-Navarro, Guillermo)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for extension of time. Follow Up Deadline due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/27/2020. (PMA)
January 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time until February 19, 2020 to file certified translation filed by Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre on behalf of Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. Responses due by 2/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quintana-Latorre, Reynaldo)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER noted #4 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/9/2020. (PMA)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/9/2020. (PMA)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER noted #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified Translations due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 1/9/2020. (PMA)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando A. Baerga-Ibanez on behalf of Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. (Baerga-Ibanez, Fernando)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPY. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS WITH STAFF. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 8/7/2017.(gav)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting Category Sheet and Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint, filed by Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. filed by Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre on behalf of Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Quintana-Latorre, Reynaldo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre on behalf of Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quintana-Latorre, Reynaldo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and Request for Additional Time to File the Same filed by Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre on behalf of Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quintana-Latorre, Reynaldo)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) against Unidad Laboral de Enfermeras(os) y Empleados de la Salud (ULEES) ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6730629.), filed by Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc.. Service due by 3/19/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Quintana-Latorre, Reynaldo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc. v. Unidad Laboral de Enfermeras(os) y Empleados de la Salud (ULEES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unidad Laboral de Enfermeras(os) y Empleados de la Salud (ULEES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hospital San Carlos Borromeo, Inc.
Represented By: Reynaldo A. Quintana-Latorre
Represented By: Fernando A. Baerga-Ibanez
Represented By: Guillermo Figueroa-Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?