United States of America (Farm Service Agency) v. Bonilla Garcia et al
Plaintiff: United States of America (Farm Service Agency)
Defendant: Edgardo Bonilla Garcia, Olga Montalvo Fernandez and Conjugal Partnership composed by Edgardo Bonilla Garcia and Olga Montalvo Fernandez
Case Number: 3:2019cv02149
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (Farm Service Agency) upon Conjugal Partnership composed by Edgardo Bonilla Garcia and Olga Montalvo Fernandez served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (Farm Service Agency) upon Olga Montalvo Fernandez served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (Farm Service Agency) upon Edgardo Bonilla Garcia served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Reply due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 2/10/2020. (RIF)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America (Farm Service Agency) filed by Jose Martinez-Custodio on behalf of Edgardo Bonilla Garcia, Conjugal Partnership composed by Edgardo Bonilla Garcia and Olga Montalvo Fernandez, Olga Montalvo Fernandez Responses due by 2/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Custodio, Jose)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPY. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS WITH STAFF. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edgardo Bonilla Garcia, Conjugal Partnership composed by Edgardo Bonilla Garcia and Olga Montalvo Fernandez, Olga Montalvo Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America (Farm Service Agency). Service due by 3/19/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Edgardo Bonilla, #4 Summons Olga Montalvo Fernandez, #5 Summons Conjugal Partnership, #6 Appendix Index to Appendix, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America (Farm Service Agency) v. Bonilla Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Bonilla Garcia
Represented By: Jose Martinez-Custodio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Montalvo Fernandez
Represented By: Jose Martinez-Custodio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership composed by Edgardo Bonilla Garcia and Olga Montalvo Fernandez
Represented By: Jose Martinez-Custodio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (Farm Service Agency)
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?