Dapena-Guerrero et al v. Lyons-Rios
Plaintiff: Ramon E. Dapena-Guerrero, Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, Morell Cartagena & Dapena, Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, LLC. and Morell Cartagena & Dapena, LLC
Defendant: Nilsa Lyons Rios and Nilsa Lyons-Rios
Case Number: 3:2019cv02161
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Informative Motion: NOTED. Answer due March 1, 2020. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/03/2020. (brc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Agreement to Respond to Complaint by March 1, 2020 filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Ramon E. Dapena-Guerrero, Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, LLC., Morell Cartagena & Dapena, LLC Responses due by 2/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Defendant)(Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons by Publication as to Nilsa Lyons-Rios. (Attachments: #1 Summons By Publication) (ad)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION re #3 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/31/2020. (brc)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Motion for Service by Publication: GRANTED. Service of process by publication is ordered on defendant. Order and summons to issue. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/31/2020. (brc)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Nilsa Lyons-Rios filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, LLC., Morell Cartagena & Dapena, LLC, Ramon E. Dapena-Guerrero Responses due by 2/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Summons by Publication)(Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nilsa Lyons Rios (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (ad)
December 27, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number 0104-6733610 (arg)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nilsa Lyons Rios, filed by Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, Morell Cartagena & Dapena, Ramon E. Dapena-Guerrero. Service due by 3/26/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dapena-Guerrero et al v. Lyons-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon E. Dapena-Guerrero
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morell Cartagena & Dapena
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, LLC.
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morell Cartagena & Dapena, LLC
Represented By: Ivan Llado-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilsa Lyons Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilsa Lyons-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?