Martinez-Lopez et al v. MCS Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Karen Martinez-Lopez and Rafael A Garcia-Lugo
Defendant: MCS Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv02162
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Defendant is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/31/2020. (EA)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2020 to File Answer to the Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Karen Martinez-Lopez, Rafael A Garcia-Lugo filed by Ramon E. Dapena on behalf of MCS Life Insurance Company Responses due by 2/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Dapena, Ramon) Modified on 1/29/2020 change italics (gav).
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon MCS Life Insurance Company served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/7/2017.(gav)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MCS Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (ad)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MCS Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6733660.), filed by Karen Martinez-Lopez, Rafael A Garcia-Lugo. Service due by 3/26/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Appendix Current Address Notice)(San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Lopez et al v. MCS Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Martinez-Lopez
Represented By: Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael A Garcia-Lugo
Represented By: Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramon E. Dapena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?