Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Garcia Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2017-1, by Franklin Credit Management Corporation as Servicer and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Berenguer, Angel Miguel Garcia Rodriguez and Wilmary Berenguer Calderon
Case Number: 3:2019cv02167
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Wilmary Berenguer Calderon, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Berenguer, Angel Miguel Garcia Rodriguez. (gav)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Entry of Default. The Court notes that the Defendants are in default as hey have failed to answer Plaintiff's complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is to make an entry of default against the Defendants. The entry of default will only be lifted upon filing of an informative motion by the Defendants wherein an appropriate showing of good cause is made and upon the filing of their answer to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 2/26/2020. (CBM)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Andres Saez-Marrero on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 3/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Saez-Marrero, Andres)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed on all defendants by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon All Defendants. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) Modified on 1/22/2020 edit text (gav).
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wilmary Berenguer Calderon, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Berenguer, Angel Miguel Garcia Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT : Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (ad)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2017-1, by Franklin Credit Management Corporation as Servicer, Wilmary Berenguer Calderon, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Berenguer ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6734844.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2017-1, by Franklin Credit Management Corporation as Servicer. Service due by 3/30/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Mortgage Deed, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Conjugal Partnership, #6 Summons Wilmary Berenguer, #7 Summons Angel Garcia, #8 Exhibit Demand letters)(Saez-Marrero, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Garcia Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Certificate Trustee of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2017-1, by Franklin Credit Management Corporation as Servicer
Represented By: Andres Saez-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Andres Saez-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Berenguer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Miguel Garcia Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmary Berenguer Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?