Rios-Rodriguez v. Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez
Defendant: Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico and Hon. Dennis Longo-Quinones
Case Number: 3:2020cv01013
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Denying #6 "Motion Requesting Translator." The court does not provide interpreter services in civil cases. However, it will grant pro se plaintiff a final extension of 30 days, that is, until March 27, 2020, to file a certified translation in the English language of the complaint and all supporting documents. Failure to comply may result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/26/2020. (MPL)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION requesting Translator (in the Spanish Language) filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, pro se. Responses due by 2/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mr)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is allowed until February 18, 2020, to file a certified translation in the English language of the complaint and all supporting documents. He is also reminded that any other pleading must be filed in English or accompanied by a certified English translation, as required by 48 U.S.C. sec. 864 ("[a]ll pleadings and proceedings in the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico shall be conducted in the English language")and Local Rule 5(g) ("[a]ll documents not in the English language which are presented or filed, whether as evidence or otherwise, must be accompanied by a certified translation into English prepared by a interpreter certified by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts"). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/17/2020. (MPL)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro se. (gmm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro se. Responses due by 1/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico, Dennis Longo Longo-Quinones (in the Spanish Language) filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro se. Service due by 4/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(gmm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez, Pro se. Responses due by 1/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios-Rodriguez v. Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de Justicia de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Dennis Longo-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Rios-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?