Casellas Toro v. Martinez Adorno
Petitioner: Pablo Casellas Toro
Respondent: Lorraine Martinez Adorno
Case Number: 3:2020cv01014
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision of U.S. Supreme Court in Ramos v. Lousiana, No. 18-5924 filed by Francisco Rebollo-Casalduc on behalf of Pablo Casellas Toro Responses due by 3/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rebollo-Casalduc, Francisco) Modified on 3/3/2020 change italics (gav).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion submitting. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Pratt on 2/20/2020. (gav)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Lorraine Martinez Adorno (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 294(d), this case is reassigned to the docket of Senior U.S. District Judge Robert W. Pratt from the Southern District of Iowa, to preside over all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear his initials next to the case number: 20-cv-1014(RP). Signed by Chief Justice John Roberts on 02/12/2020. (gr)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service Upon Opposing Party filed by Francisco Rebollo-Casalduc on behalf of Pablo Casellas Toro Responses due by 2/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rebollo-Casalduc, Francisco)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Substitute Document filed by Francisco Rebollo-Casalduc on behalf of Pablo Casellas Toro Responses due by 2/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Rebollo-Casalduc, Francisco)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez.(Filing Fee $5.00, Receipt Number PRX100069204) (arg) Modified on 2/5/2020 to correct filing fee amount (ft).
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Pablo Casellas Toro Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Pablo Casellas Toro filed by Pablo Casellas Toro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1., #2 Exhibit 2., #3 Exhibit 3., #4 Exhibit 4., #5 Exhibit 5., #6 Exhibit 6., #7 Exhibit 7., #8 Exhibit 8.)(Rebollo-Casalduc, Francisco)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254 THAT IS 36 PAGES IN LENGTH filed by Francisco Rebollo-Casalduc on behalf of Pablo Casellas Toro Responses due by 1/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rebollo-Casalduc, Francisco)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Pablo Casellas Toro. Service due by 4/14/2020, (Attachments: #1 Addendum A, #2 Addendum B)(Rebollo-Casalduc, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casellas Toro v. Martinez Adorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorraine Martinez Adorno
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pablo Casellas Toro
Represented By: Francisco Rebollo-Casalduc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?