MIlitello v. Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners et al
Plaintiff: John P MIlitello
Defendant: Multinational Insurance Company and Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners
Case Number: 3:2020cv01041
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Notice of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time to File. Noted and Granted. Answer due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/16/2020. (wm)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/16/2020. (wm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Luis O. Soto-Colon on behalf of Multinational Insurance Company, Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners (Soto-Colon, Luis) Modified event on 3/10/2020 (idg).
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Entry as to Multinational Insurance Company, Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners filed by Jose E. De-La-Cruz-Skerrett on behalf of John P. Militello Responses due by 3/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De-La-Cruz-Skerrett, Jose)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John P. Militello upon Multinational Insurance Company served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summons - Multinational, #2 Exhibit Executed Summons - Park Boulevard) (De-La-Cruz-Skerrett, Jose)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose E. De-La-Cruz-Skerrett on behalf of John P. Militello (De-La-Cruz-Skerrett, Jose)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Multinational Insurance Company, Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Multinational Insurance Company, Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6760354.), filed by John P MIlitello. Service due by 4/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rivera-Rosario, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIlitello v. Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P MIlitello
Represented By: Rafael G. Rivera-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multinational Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Boulevard Condominium Council of Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?