Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) v. CG Printing Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) and UPAGRA
Defendant: CG Printing Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01043
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/10/2020. (MPL) Modified on 2/11/2020 to remove court only restriction (gmm).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting #22 "Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal." Based on the representations made therein, the case is dismissed without prejudice, without imposition of costs and attorney's fees. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/10/2020. (MPL)
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 Joint NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2020. Present on behalf of plaintiff was Attorney Miguel Simonet. Present on behalf of the defendant were Attorneys Julio Lugo and Ricard Schell. The Court met with the parties in chambers. The Court afforded the parties time to discuss the controversy and a possible resolution. The parties informed the Court that they've reached an agreement. The agreement will result in the dismissal without prejudice of the case and without the imposition of costs or attorneys' fees. The parties will file a joint motion today with the terms pursuant to which the Court will dismiss the case. (Court Reporter Evelys Carrion.) (cmd)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #19 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/7/2020. (MPL)
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). (cmd) Modified on 2/12/2020 to correct filer (mr).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting in Part #15 "Motion for Leave to File Documents in the Spanish Language and Extension of Time to File Translations." However, only English language documents may be used during hearing set for tomorrow in connection with Plaintiff's injunctive relief request. See Order at Docket No. 17. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/6/2020. (cc)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Denying #16 "Plaintiff's Emergency Renewed Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order." Hearing, February 7, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/6/2020. (cc)
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Re: #10 MOTION to dismiss filed by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) Modified on 2/7/2020 to edit docket text (gmm).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting #12 "Motion Submitting Documents." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/6/2020. (MPL)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #10 "Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(B)(6) of Civil Procedure." Plaintiff shall respond not later than February 6, 2020.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/3/2020. (MPL)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULE 12(B) (6) OF CIVIL PROCEDURE as to All Defendants filed by Julio I. Lugo-Munoz on behalf of CG Printing Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lugo-Munoz, Julio) Modified on 1/31/2020 as to filer (gav).
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed and Proof of Services by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) upon CG Printing Group, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt Order Docket #8, #2 Exhibit Proof of Services) (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant shall discuss the merits of plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief by the same day it answers or otherwise pleads. Plaintiff shall serve upon defendant a copy of this ORDER today. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/28/2020. (MPL)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/27/2020. (MPL)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to File Documents in the Spanish Language and Extension of Time to File Translations." Certified English translations due not later than February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/27/2020. (MPL)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CG Printing Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) Responses due by 2/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6761126.), filed by Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO). Service due by 4/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet, #10 Summons)(Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO) v. CG Printing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union de Periodistas, Artes Graficas y Ramas Anexas (Local 33225, Affiliated to the Newspaper Guild-CWA-ALF-CIO)
Represented By: Miguel Simonet-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPAGRA
Represented By: Miguel Simonet-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CG Printing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?