Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Santos-Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, as indenture trustee, for the CSMC 2015-PR1 Trust, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2015-PR1 and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Jose Enrique Santos-Garcia, Marianela Hernandez-Rivera, conjugal Santos-Hernandez and Conjugal Partnership Santos-Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2020cv01055
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 3/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marianela Hernandez-Rivera, Jose Enrique Santos-Garcia, conjugal Santos-Hernandez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6769590.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, as indenture trustee, for the CSMC 2015-PR1 Trust, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2015-PR1. Service due by 4/29/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Santos-Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Enrique Santos-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianela Hernandez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: conjugal Santos-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Santos-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, as indenture trustee, for the CSMC 2015-PR1 Trust, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2015-PR1
Represented By: Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?