Guzman-Matias et al v. Suiza Dairy Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Guzman-Matias and Rafael Juarbe-De Jesus
Defendant: Suiza Dairy Corp. and Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01073
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Motions for Extension of time filed at Docket Nos. #9 ; #10 . (i) Responses to Motions to Remand are now due by 3/27/2020. (ii) Certified Translations are now due by 3/27/2020.Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/11/2020. (ERC)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until March 27, 2020 to file certified translations filed by Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corp. Responses due by 3/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time until March 27, 2020 to oppose Motions to Remand filed by Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corp. Responses due by 3/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for extension of time to File Certified Translations. Certified Translations to be filed by 03/09/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/25/2020. (ERC)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Removed Action and to Request Abstention filed by Hector L. Moreno-Luna on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Moreno-Luna, Hector)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Partial Remand filed by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc. Responses due by 3/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Shylene De Jesus-Rivera on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corp. (De Jesus-Rivera, Shylene)
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corp. (Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)
February 10, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (ad)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for extension of time until March 9, 2020 to File Certified Translations filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Suiza Dairy Corp. Responses due by 2/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Commonwealth Court-San Juan, case number KDP99-0798. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6783213), filed by Suiza Dairy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Motion Seeking Class Certification, #3 Exhibit 3-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4-Answer to Amended Complaint-Suiza, #5 Exhibit 5-Answer to Amended Complaint-VTM, #6 Exhibit 6-Resolution and Order, #7 Exhibit 7-Judgment, #8 Exhibit 8-Supreme Court Opinion, #9 Exhibit 9-Resolution, #10 Exhibit 10-MSJ, #11 Exhibit 10- MSJ (1part), #12 Exhibit 10-MSJ (2 part, #13 Exhibit 11-Partial Judgment, #14 Exhibit 12-Opposition to MSJ, #15 Exhibit 13- Minute, #16 Exhibit 14-Joint PT Report 11/22/2011, #17 Exhibit 15-Partial Judgment, #18 Exhibit 16-Amended Pre Trial Report, #19 Exhibit 17-Resolution, #20 Exhibit 18-Joint PT (Damages), #21 Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Category Sheet EPO, #23 Category Sheet LAP, #24 Category Sheet SDR, #25 List of Counsel)(Perez-Ochoa, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman-Matias et al v. Suiza Dairy Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suiza Dairy Corp.
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Shylene De Jesus-Rivera
Represented By: Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaqueria Tres Monjitas, Inc.
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Miguel Simonet-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Guzman-Matias
Represented By: Hector L. Moreno-Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Juarbe-De Jesus
Represented By: Hector L. Moreno-Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?