Quintero et al v. Metro Santurce, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Joannie Principe, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated,, Pablo J. Quintero and Joannie Principe
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, METRO HATO REY, INC., d/b/a PAVIA HOSPITAL HATO REY, METRO SANTURCE, INC., d/b/a PAVIA HOSPITAL SANTURCE a corporation, Metro Hato Rey, Inc. and Metro Santurce, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01075
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada terminated Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/21/2021. (EES)
October 20, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada filed by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. : Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2021 at 3:30 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be held by video. The zoom meeting invite to be sent to counsel of record prior to the hearing.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/5/2021.(jg)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/30/2021. (EES)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER noted #28 Motion submitting Tender Group Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss re: 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 10/1/2021. (jg)
September 14, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Notice of Supplemental Opinion) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - Supreme Court Slip Opinion)(Estrella, Alberto)
September 1, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION Submitting Tender Group Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 9/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A - Quintero Notification Letter - Redacted, #2 Exhibit Group Exhibit A - Principe Notification Letter - Redacted)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER finding as moot #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/23/2021. (EES)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez terminated Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/14/2020. (EES)
September 10, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #23 Notice of Appearance (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez filed by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vazquez-Lozada, Jose)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/8/2020. (EES)
June 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Reply to DE 19) and Tendering Reply as Exhibit filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 6/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Estrella, Alberto)
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 10, 2020 to file Motion for Leave to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 6/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto) Modified on 6/1/2020 to edit docket text (vso).
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Joannie Principe, Pablo J. Quintero Re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Joannie Principe, Pablo J. Quintero. (Marquez, Justin) Modified on 5/28/2020 change italics (gav).
May 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 5/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement byMetro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc.. (Estrella, Alberto)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/13/2020. (EES)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to allow Rosa Tumialn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6883019) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 5/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #13 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/6/2020. (EES)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to allow Justin Marquez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6875172) filed by David C. Indiano-Vicic on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to allow Robert Dart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6875147) filed by David C. Indiano-Vicic on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to allow Thiago Coelho to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6875128) filed by David C. Indiano-Vicic on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/13/2020. (EES)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 13, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Pablo J. Quintero, Joannie Principe filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 4/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/9/2020. (EES)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to allow Cinthia Motley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6854428) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. Responses due by 4/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. (Estrella, Alberto)
February 17, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pablo J. Quintero, Joannie Principe. Metro Hato Rey, Inc. waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020; Metro Santurce, Inc. waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metro Hato Rey, Inc., Metro Santurce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 2/13/2020 change (gav).
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6787152.), filed by Pablo J. Quintero, Joannie Principe, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated,. Service due by 5/11/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero et al v. Metro Santurce, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRO HATO REY, INC., d/b/a PAVIA HOSPITAL HATO REY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRO SANTURCE, INC., d/b/a PAVIA HOSPITAL SANTURCE a corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Hato Rey, Inc.
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Rosa M. Tumialan
Represented By: Cinthia G. Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Santurce, Inc.
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Rosa M. Tumialan
Represented By: Cinthia G. Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joannie Principe, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated,
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo J. Quintero
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert James Dart
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Represented By: Thiago M. Coelho
Represented By: Justin F. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joannie Principe
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jose Manuel Vazquez-Lozada
Represented By: Justin F. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?