Fort v. Abzco LLC et al
Plaintiff: Migdalia Fort
Defendant: Abzco LLC, Carlos Lazaro-Castro, PRLP Fe LLC, Jan Carlos-Vazquez and Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta
Case Number: 3:2020cv01082
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Dora L. Monserrate on behalf of Abzco LLC, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Jan Carlos-Vazquez, Carlos Lazaro-Castro Responses due by 4/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Monserrate, Dora)
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Migdalia Fort, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Sanctions as to Migdalia Fort filed by Dora L. Monserrate on behalf of Jan Carlos-Vazquez, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Abzco LLC, Carlos Lazaro-Castro Responses due by 4/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Annex A, #2 Exhibit Annex B, #3 Exhibit Annex C)(Monserrate, Dora)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez on behalf of Abzco LLC, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Jan Carlos-Vazquez, Carlos Lazaro-Castro (Schell-Gonzalez, Richard)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of PRLP Fe LLC Responses due by 4/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Discovery due by 3/22/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2021. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Jury Trial set for 9/20/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/20/2020.(grf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto) Modified on 3/20/2020 to correct title (ab).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED, until April 9, 2020 to answer the complaint. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/17/2020. (brc)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. Answer deadline April 9, 2020. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/17/2020. (brc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of PRLP Fe LLC (Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until April 10, 2020 to Answer to the Complaint filed by Dora L. Monserrate on behalf of Abzco LLC, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Jan Carlos-Vazquez, Carlos Lazaro-Castro Responses due by 3/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Monserrate, Dora)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until April 9, 2020 to file PRLP FE Properties, LLC'sresponsive pleading filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of PRLP Fe LLC Responses due by 3/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez on behalf of Abzco LLC, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Carlos Lazaro-Castro, Jan Carlos-Vazquez (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando) Modified on 3/10/2020 to correct filers (ab).
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dora L. Monserrate on behalf of Abzco LLC, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Jan Carlos-Vazquez, Carlos Lazaro-Castro (Monserrate, Dora)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel to correct sequence of pages and re-file***SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto) Modified on 2/20/2020 (ab). Modified on 2/20/2020 (ab).
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Abzco LLC, Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta, Jan Carlos-Vazquez, Carlos Lazaro-Castro, PRLP Fe LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6792193.), filed by Migdalia Fort. Service due by 5/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons ABZCO LLC, #4 Summons Summons PRLP FE LLC, #5 Summons Summons Alejandro Brito, #6 Summons Summons Carlos Lazaro, #7 Summons Summons Jan Carlos)(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fort v. Abzco LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abzco LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez
Represented By: Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Lazaro-Castro
Represented By: Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez
Represented By: Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRLP Fe LLC
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Carlos-Vazquez
Represented By: Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez
Represented By: Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Brito-Zubizarreta
Represented By: Richard J. Schell-Gonzalez
Represented By: Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Migdalia Fort
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?