Ambac Assurance Corporation v. Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC
Plaintiff: Ambac Assurance Corporation
Defendant: Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01094
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Stay Case Pursuant to Stipulation filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 5/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion (I) to Reassign Case to Judge Laura Taylor Swain and Stay the Proceedings Pending Reassignment and (Ii) for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation Re: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC, #10 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Laura Taylor Swain and to Stay the Proceedings Pending Reassignment filed by Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
March 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 19, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz on behalf of Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 3/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to allow Jonathan D. Fortney to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070226) filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to allow Matt J. Williams to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070226) filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
March 9, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #14 Motion to allow Keith R. Martorana to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070201), #16 Motion to allow James L. Hallowell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070201), #15 Motion to allow Matthew P. Porcelli to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070201). ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking PHV Counsel's Manual Signature. To be re-filed.*** (rom) Modified on 3/11/2020 (rom).
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to allow James L. Hallowell to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070201) filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 3/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan) Modified on 3/10/2020 (rom). Modified on 3/11/2020 (rom).
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to allow Matthew P. Porcelli to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070201) filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan) Modified on 3/10/2020 (rom). Modified on 3/11/2020 (rom).
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to allow Keith R. Martorana to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100070201) filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 3/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan) Modified on 3/10/2020 (rom).
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz on behalf of Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ambac Assurance Corporation upon Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1 filed by Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Laura Taylor Swain and to Stay the Proceedings Pending Reassignment filed by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 3/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad on behalf of Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC (Zouairabani-Trinidad, Nayuan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 "Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The applications are GRANTED. The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/28/2020. (LMR)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to allow Olga L. Fuentes-Skinner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6813478) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 3/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to allow Shai Schmidt to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6813467) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 3/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to allow Andrew Glenn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6813456) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 3/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to allow Marissa Miller to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6813441) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 3/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6799168.), filed by Ambac Assurance Corporation. Service due by 5/19/2020, (Attachments: #1 Summons Metropistas - Case no. 3:20-cv-01094, #2 Category Sheet Case no. 3:20-cv-01094, #3 Civil Cover Sheet AMBAC - Case no. 3:20-cv-01094)(Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambac Assurance Corporation v. Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambac Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Olga L. Fuentes-Skinner
Represented By: Andrew Glenn
Represented By: Shai Schmidt
Represented By: Marissa Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autopistas Metropolitanas de Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?