United States of America v. Sumaza & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Viejo San Juan, LLC, Fernando L. Sumaza & Co., Inc., Virgen Del Pozo Limited Partnership, Trois Marie Dividend Limited Partnership, San Fernando Limited Partnership, S.E. and La Inmaculada Limited Partnership, S.E.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01114
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amended Consent Order, #2 Appendix) (gmm)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Amend Consent Order filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 3/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SUMAZA Amended Consent Order)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector) Modified on 3/9/2020 to edit title (gmm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/3/2020. (CRH)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting #2 Consent Motion Requesting Order Entry and Brief in support. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/3/2020. (CRH)
March 3, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (ad)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Consent MOTION requesting Order entry and Brief in support filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 3/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against La Inmaculada Limited Partnership, S.E., San Fernando Limited Partnership, S.E., Fernando L. Sumaza & Co., Inc., Trois Marie Dividend Limited Partnership, Viejo San Juan, LLC, Virgen Del Pozo Limited Partnership, filed by United States of America. Service due by 5/28/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sumaza & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viejo San Juan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando L. Sumaza & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgen Del Pozo Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trois Marie Dividend Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Fernando Limited Partnership, S.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Inmaculada Limited Partnership, S.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Hector Ramirez-Carbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?