United States of America v. Planell Marquez et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Maria del Pilar Acevedo Viera, Francisco Enrique Planell Marquez and Conjugal Partnership Planell-Acevedo
Case Number: 3:2020cv01137
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE. Pursuant to the Order to Stay All Foreclosure Proceedings Until May 30, 2020, Misc. No. 20-088 (GAG), the Court hereby STAYS the instant proceedings until May 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 3/27/2020. (CBM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Maria del Pilar Acevedo Viera, Conjugal Partnership Planell-Acevedo, Francisco Enrique Planell Marquez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 6/9/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit $15,000 Note, #2 Exhibit Deed 74, #3 Exhibit $100,000 Note, #4 Exhibit Deed 36, #5 Exhibit $50,000 Note, #6 Exhibit Deed 103, #7 Exhibit Deed 54, #8 Exhibit Property 5,920, #9 Exhibit Property 3,307, #10 Exhibit COI, #11 Exhibit SCRA's, #12 Summons Francisco Planell Marquez, #13 Summons Maria Acevedo Viera, #14 Summons Conjugal Partnership Planell-Acevedo, #15 Category Sheet, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Planell Marquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria del Pilar Acevedo Viera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Enrique Planell Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Planell-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?