Robledo v. Siemens Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Robledo
Defendant: Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Pattern Santa Isabel LLC and Siemens Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01161
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Robledo upon Pattern Santa Isabel LLC served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Loubriel, Carla)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Robledo upon Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Loubriel, Carla)
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Robledo upon Siemens Energy, Inc. served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Loubriel, Carla)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Pattern Santa Isabel LLC, Siemens Energy, Inc., Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Issuance of Summons "Motion allowed, the plaintiff shall make service." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 5/5/2020. (EES)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Issuance of Summons on an Expedited Basis as to Pattern Santa Isabel LLC, Siemens Energy, Inc., Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of Jose Robledo Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Siemens Energy, Inc., #2 Summons Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc., #3 Summons Pattern Santa Isabel LLC)(Loubriel, Carla)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #12 MOTION for Issuance of Summons on an Expedited Basis as to Pattern Santa Isabel LLC, Siemens Energy, Inc., Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password.*** (gav)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password.*** MOTION for Issuance of Summons on an Expedited Basis as to Pattern Santa Isabel LLC, Siemens Energy, Inc., Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc. filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of Jose Robledo Responses due by 5/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Siemens Energy, Inc., #2 Summons Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc., #3 Summons Pattern Santa Isabel LLC)(Loubriel, Carla) Modified on 5/5/2020 change italics (gav). Modified on 5/5/2020 (gav).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/30/2020.(EES)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/30/2020. (EES)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to allow Michael Darling to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6869473) filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loubriel, Carla)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Jose Robledo filed by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. Responses due by 5/12/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #5 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 4/28/2020. (EES)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to allow Ryan S. MacLeod to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6867843) filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loubriel, Carla)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to allow Cory D. Itkin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6867836) filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loubriel, Carla)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo F. Casellas on behalf of Jose Robledo (Casellas, Ricardo)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6845277.), filed by Jose Robledo. Service due by 6/24/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Loubriel, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robledo v. Siemens Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Robledo
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Ryan S. McLeod
Represented By: Michael Darling
Represented By: Cory D. Itkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pattern Santa Isabel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?