Medtronic Medical CR SRL CR SRL v. Feliciano-Soto et al
Plaintiff: MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL
Defendant: Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Elieser Feliciano-Soto, Innovative Engineering, LLC and Innovative Engineering Corp.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01165
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/9/2020. (DMA)
December 8, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition filed by Medtronics-CR at Docket 51 and for Enlargement of Time filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 12/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 12/9/2020 remove italics (gav).
December 4, 2020 Filing 52 STATEMENT Regarding Motions to Dismiss Directed to Verified Complaint filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elieser Feliciano-Soto, #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 9, 12 and 19 of the Fed.R.Civ.P.) filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering Corp.. (Perez-Soto, Ana) Modified on 12/7/2020 remove italics (gav).
December 4, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL Re: #27 MOTION to dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Request Under Forum Non Conveniens Doctrine as to Medtronic Medical CR SRL filed by Elieser Feliciano-Soto, #31 MOTION to dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens as to Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., Jose Enrique Santana-Criado filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp. filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Medtronic-CRs Request for Cancellation of Work Visa, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Anabelle Leon Feoli, #3 Exhibit 3 - CV of Anabelle Leon Feoli)(Perez-Soto, Ana) Modified on 12/7/2020 change italics (gav).
December 1, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Response to Plaintiffs' Informative Motion Concerning Amended Verified Complaint and Rico Case Statement (DKT. 48) and Leave to Join Innovatives Response (DKT. 49) filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 12/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 12/2/2020 replace all caps(gav).
November 30, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Joinder Innovative's Response to Plaintiff's Informative Motion and Request for Enlargement of Time filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 12/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
November 30, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Plaintiffs Informative Motion Concerning Amended Verified Complaint and Rico Case Statement filed by Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Re: #43 Amended Complaint filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL, #45 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND RICO CASE STATEMENT filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL, #44 Statement filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL filed by Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado. (Rullan-Marin, Luis)
November 30, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL Re: #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., #41 MOTION for Joinder OF OPPOSITION TO WRIT OF ATTACHEMENT FILED AT DOCKET 36 WITH SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO SAID WRIT Re: #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Enginee filed by Elieser Feliciano-Soto filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL. (Cartagena-Cancel, Maria)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File. Reply must comply with the PRD Local Rules. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/13/2020. (DMA)
November 12, 2020 Filing 45 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Amended Verified Complaint and Rico Case Statement filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 11/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 11/13/2020 edit text (gav).
November 12, 2020 Filing 44 Amended STATEMENT filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 12, 2020 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elieser Feliciano-Soto, Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL.(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
November 12, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Motion Requesting Leave to Join Opposition to Writ of Attachment Filed at Docket 36 With Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Said Writ (Dkt. 41) filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 11/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 11/13/2020 edit text (gav).
November 5, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Joinder of Opposition to Writ of Attachment Filed at Docket 36 with Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Said Writ Re: #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp. filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 11/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 11/6/2020 edit text (gav).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and #39 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/5/2020. (DMA)
November 4, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion for Writ of Attachment (Dkt. 36) filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 11/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 11/5/2020 change italics (gav).
November 4, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 4, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Request Under Forum Non Conveniens Doctrine as to Medtronic Medical CR SRL filed by Elieser Feliciano-Soto, #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elieser Feliciano-Soto, #31 MOTION to dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens as to Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., Jose Enrique Santana-Criado filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 9, 12 and 19 of the Fed.R.Civ.P.) filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering Corp. filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 11/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #27 , #26 , #31 , #30 ) (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 11/5/2020 change italics (gav).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/2/2020. (DMA)
November 2, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Writ of Attachment filed by Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Re: #21 MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL filed by Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 11/4/2020 edit text (gav).
November 2, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 5, 2020 to File Response/Reply to Writ of Attachment filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 11/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Motions at Docket Nos. #29 , #32 and #33 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/27/2020. (DMA)
October 23, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens and submit omitted attachments Re: #31 MOTION to dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens as to Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., Jose Enrique Santana-Criado filed by Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp. filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Entry 191 in case 2:95-cv-03212 before the E.D. of Louisiana, #2 Exhibit Docket Entry 197 in case 2:95-cv-03212 before the E.D. of Louisiana, #3 Exhibit Docket Entry 214 in case 2:95-cv-03212 before the E.D. of Louisiana, #4 Exhibit Opinion in Vargas v. General Electric Co., 2010 Conn. Super. Ct. 9821 (Conn. Super. Ct. 2010))(Related document(s) #31 ) (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/26/2020 change italics (gav).
October 23, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Document joining Codefendant Feliciano's Motion at D.E. 27 filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/26/2020 change italics (gav).
October 23, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens as to Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., Jose Enrique Santana-Criado filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering, LLC, Innovative Engineering Corp., Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/26/2020 change italics (gav).
October 23, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 9, 12 and 19 of the Fed.R.Civ.P.) filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/26/2020 change italics (gav).
October 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 9, 12 and 19 of the Fed.R.Civ.P.) filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 11/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/26/2020 edit text (gav).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/23/2020. (DMA)
October 22, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Request Under Forum Non Conveniens Doctrine as to Medtronic Medical CR SRL filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 11/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 10/23/2020 edit text (gav).
October 22, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 11/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 22, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead (Instanter) until October 23, 2020 re: #1 Complaint, filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 11/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/23/2020 change italics (gav).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Stay; granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; noted #23 Motion for Joinder. Petitioners' are hereby allowed to file a response to the Motion at Docket No. #21 on or before November 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/19/2020. (DMA)
October 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Joinder of Request Filed at Docket 22 filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 10/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 10/19/2020 change italics (gav).
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Consideration of Motion For Writ Of Attachment Or, MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2nd, 2020 to File Response/Reply filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 10/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 10/19/2020 change italics (gav).
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Writ of Attachment filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury in Support of Motion for Writ of Attachment, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL re: #1 Complaint, filed by Medtronic Medical CR SRL, 19 Order on Motion requesting Order,, Order on Motion for Joinder,. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion requesting Order; granting #18 Motion for Joinder. The Court hereby Orders Plaintiff to Comply with the Rico Case Statement Standing Order (https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/rico-case-statement-standing-order) on or before October 2, 2020. Defendants will have 20 calendar days after the filing of the corresponding Rico Case Statement to answer the complaint or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/24/2020. (DMA)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder of Request for Order at Docket 17 filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 10/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 9/24/2020 change italics (gav).
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION requesting Order to Comply with RICO Case Statement Standing Order filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis) Modified on 9/23/2020 change italics (gav).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting #15 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/8/2020. (DMA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for extension of time until October 8, 2020 to to answer or otherwise plead filed by Luis G. Rullan-Marin on behalf of Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rullan-Marin, Luis)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/1/2020. (DMA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear AND, MOTION for Extension of Time until October 1, 2020 to File Answer filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Elieser Feliciano-Soto Responses due by 9/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed on All Defendants by Medtronic Medical CR SRL upon Elieser Feliciano-Soto served on 8/8/2020, answer due 8/31/2020; Innovative Engineering Corp. served on 8/15/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Innovative Engineering, LLC served on 8/15/2020, answer due 9/8/2020; Jose Enrique Santana-Criado served on 8/15/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons of Defendant Elieser Feliciano, #2 Summons Summons of Defendant Jose Santana Criado, #3 Summons Summons of Innovative Eng. Corp., #4 Summons Summons of Innovative Eng. LLC) (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie) Modified on 8/20/2020 change italics(gav).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for extension of time. Pursuant to Rule 4 (m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court grants a 60-day extension for Plaintiff to complete the service of process upon Defendants. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 6/30/2020. (DMA)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion requesting Order. See Docket No. #8 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 6/30/2020. (DMA)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time until August 28, 2020 to Serve Process filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of Medtronic Medical CR SRL Responses due by 7/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Elieser Feliciano-Soto, Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION requesting Order for Issuance of Summons filed by Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez on behalf of MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL Responses due by 4/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Feliciano-Soto, #2 Summons Summons - Santana-Criado, #3 Summons Summons - Innovative Engineering, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - Innovative Engineering Corp.)(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL (Perez-Soto, Ana)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo J. Garcia-Sola on behalf of MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL (Garcia-Sola, Arturo)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria C. Cartagena-Cancel on behalf of MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL (Cartagena-Cancel, Maria)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6850391.) re #1 Complaint, filed by MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL, filed by MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL.(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elieser Feliciano-Soto, Innovative Engineering Corp., Innovative Engineering, LLC, Jose Enrique Santana-Criado, filed by MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL. Service due by 7/1/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Flores-Rodriguez, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medtronic Medical CR SRL CR SRL v. Feliciano-Soto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Enrique Santana-Criado
Represented By: Luis G. Rullan-Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elieser Feliciano-Soto
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Luis G. Rullan-Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Engineering Corp.
Represented By: Luis G. Rullan-Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDTRONIC MEDICAL CR SRL
Represented By: Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Represented By: Maria C. Cartagena-Cancel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?