ManpowerGroup, Inc. v. Skalar Phama, LLC.
Plaintiff: ManpowerGroup, Inc. on behalf of its Experis Puerto Rico Division and ManpowerGroup, Inc.
Defendant: Skalar Phama, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01167
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED. The translations of exhibits not accompanied by translations will be filed no later than June 8, 2020. Additionally, plaintiff shall file, also by June 8, 2020, official or certified English translations of all cases decided by the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico on which plaintiff relies in its motion. See, 48 U.S.C. sec. 864; Puerto Ricans for Puerto Rico Party v. Dalmau, 544 F.3d 58, 67 (1st Cir. 2008). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/26/2020. (brc)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of ManpowerGroup, Inc. Responses due by 6/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION requesting Order for Provisional Remedies to Secure Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Leany Prieto-Rodriguez on behalf of ManpowerGroup, Inc. Responses due by 6/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Collection Efforts, #4 Exhibit Registry of Corporations and Entities, #5 Exhibit State Court Claim, #6 Exhibit State Court Claim, #7 Exhibit State Court Default Judgment, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order Writ)(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Skalar Phama, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skalar Phama, LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6852303.), filed by ManpowerGroup, Inc. on behalf of its Experis Puerto Rico Division. Service due by 7/6/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2(A-J) - Invoices, #4 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #5 Summons Skalar Pharma, LLC. Summons)(Prieto-Rodriguez, Leany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ManpowerGroup, Inc. v. Skalar Phama, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skalar Phama, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ManpowerGroup, Inc. on behalf of its Experis Puerto Rico Division
Represented By: Leany Prieto-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ManpowerGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Leany Prieto-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?