Torres Dillon et al v. Maldonado
Plaintiff: Sharon D Meijer and Allison Torres Dillon
Defendant: Elidaniel Maldonado
Case Number: 3:2020cv01205
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 Summons Issued. ***FILED IN ERROR. Duplicate filing as in D.E. #4.*** (vso)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR. Duplicate filing as in D.E. #4 *** Summons Issued as to Elidaniel Maldonado (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) Modified on 6/19/2020 to file in error (vso).
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elidaniel Maldonado (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS (Summons) re: #1 Complaint. (Pineiro-Rosado, Hector) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit title (gmm).
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elidaniel Maldonado ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6871380.), filed by Allison Torres Dillon, Sharon D Meijer. Service due by 7/29/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Pineiro-Rosado, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres Dillon et al v. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elidaniel Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon D Meijer
Represented By: Hector E. Pineiro-Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Torres Dillon
Represented By: Hector E. Pineiro-Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?