Matos Collazo v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Zoraida Matos Collazo
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv01211
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for extension of time. Answer now due by 8/12/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/30/2020. (ERC)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until August 12, 2020 to extend time to answer or respond to complaint filed by Andrew M. Eschen on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 6/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Eschen, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge L. Matos on behalf of United States of America (Matos, Jorge)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Eschen on behalf of United States of America (Eschen, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF. Counsel to refile Notice without fillable format*** NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #7 Notice of Appearance. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF filed in fillable format. *** NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Eschen on behalf of United States of America (Eschen, Andrew) Modified on 6/5/2020 (mg).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Proof of Service by Certified Mail; noted #5 Second INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Proof of Service by Certified Mail. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/27/2020. (ERC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Second INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Proof of Service by Certified Mail filed by Emanuel Rier-Soto on behalf of Zoraida Matos Collazo Responses due by 6/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Rier-Soto, Emanuel)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Proof of Service by Certified Mail filed by Emanuel Rier-Soto on behalf of Zoraida Matos Collazo Responses due by 5/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service by Certified Mail)(Rier-Soto, Emanuel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorneys Office & U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zoraida Matos Collazo ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6874233.), filed by Zoraida Matos Collazo. Service due by 8/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons (District Attorney), #4 Summons Summons (Attorney General))(Rier-Soto, Emanuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matos Collazo v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoraida Matos Collazo
Represented By: Emanuel Rier-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?