Tirado-Maldonado et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnershop, Damilka Parra-Toribio, Luis Maldonado-Tirado, Luis Manuel Tirado-Maldonado and Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Parra
Defendant: Corporations A, B and C, Insurance Companies X. Y and Z, John Doe, Jane Roe and JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01213
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer or motion under Rule 12(b) shall be filed no later than July 11, 2020. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/01/2020. (brc)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 11, 2020 to File Answer or OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Edwin J. Seda-Fernandez on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation Responses due by 6/15/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Seda-Fernandez, Edwin)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin J. Seda-Fernandez on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Seda-Fernandez, Edwin)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Haack-Pizarro, Mariel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon JetBlue Airways Corporation served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Pena-Ramon, Raphael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Manuel Tirado-Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Parra, Damilka Parra-Toribio. Service due by 8/4/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Pena-Ramon, Raphael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JetBlue Airways Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR. Missing signature. Counsel informed by telephone***COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luis Maldonado-Tirado, Conjugal Partnershop, Damilka Parra-Toribio. Service due by 8/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons JetBlue Airways Corporation)(Pena-Ramon, Raphael) Modified on 5/6/2020 (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tirado-Maldonado et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations A, B and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies X. Y and Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Edwin J. Seda-Fernandez
Represented By: Mariel Y. Haack-Pizarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnershop
Represented By: Raphael Pena-Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damilka Parra-Toribio
Represented By: Raphael Pena-Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Maldonado-Tirado
Represented By: Raphael Pena-Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Manuel Tirado-Maldonado
Represented By: Raphael Pena-Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Parra
Represented By: Raphael Pena-Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?