TrueBlue, Inc. v. ESJ Towers, Inc.
Plaintiff: TrueBlue, Inc.
Defendant: ESJ Towers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01218
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion to Withdraw: GRANTED and NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/04/2020. (brc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Civil Cover Sheet and Waiver of Service of Summons Form (Docket Nos. 1-8 & 1-9) filed by Angelica Sofia Vazquez-Lozada on behalf of Spartan Staffing Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 6/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Vazquez-Lozada, Angelica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ESJ Towers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6878114.) re #1 Complaint,, filed by TrueBlue, Inc., filed by TrueBlue, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by TrueBlue, Inc..(Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of TrueBlue, Inc. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESJ Towers, Inc., filed by TrueBlue, Inc.. Service due by 8/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Supply TEs Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Repayment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Addendum, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - ESJ's Email in Response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Final Notice of Default, #7 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Waiver of Summons, #10 Summons Summons)(Vazquez-Lozada, Angelica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TrueBlue, Inc. v. ESJ Towers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESJ Towers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TrueBlue, Inc.
Represented By: Angelica Sofia Vazquez-Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?